Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Angel Kelley
Case #: 1:25-cv-11024
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 12:07 PM EDT
Defendant
City of Boston
Defendant
Mayor of Boston Michelle Wu
Plaintiff
The Satanic Temple, Inc.
64 Bridge Street
Salem, MA 01970


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 4 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 10:33 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. Standing Order Regarding Motion Practice. (CEH)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 10:30 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Boston, Michelle Wu. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (CEH)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 04/23 10:21 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (SP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10964228 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by The Satanic Temple, Inc..(Lee, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit