New York Southern District Court
Judge:Nelson Stephen Roman
Case #: 7:25-cv-03248
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 FMLA: Family and Medical Leave Act (Findings and Purposes)
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 1:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Lavelle School for the Blind
Defendant
Rebecca Renshaw
Plaintiff
Erica Wasserman
Represented By
Joseph Jeziorkowski
Valiant Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 3:55 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rebecca Renshaw..(jgo)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 3:55 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lavelle School for the Blind..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/21 1:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rebecca Renshaw, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Erica Wasserman..(Jeziorkowski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/21 12:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lavelle School for the Blind, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Erica Wasserman..(Jeziorkowski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Francis Knight, IV on behalf of Erica Wasserman..(Knight, William)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 04/21 9:33 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 04/21 9:33 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 04/21 9:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/18 1:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jeziorkowski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 12:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Lavelle School for the Blind, Rebecca Renshaw. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30953779)Document filed by Erica Wasserman..(Jeziorkowski, Joseph)
Related: [-]