Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10497

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:25-ap-50556
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Buhler Commercial Construction
400 Brannan Street, Suite 204
San Francisco, CA 94107
Represented By
Buhler Commercial Construction
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Barlow, Heather L. Barlow, Liquidating Trustee of the Structurlam Liquidating Trust
Represented By
LESLIE B. SPOLTORE
Obermayer Redmann Maxwell & Hippell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 11:04 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Heather Barlow. (SPOLTORE, LESLIE)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 04/23 12:01 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Buhler Commercial Construction. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (SPOLTORE, LESLIE)
Related: [-] ument1
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 04/18 12:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50556 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A12134242, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 04/18 12:16 PM
Adversary case 25-50556 Complaint by Heather Barlow against Buhler Commercial Construction. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). AP Summons Served due date: 7/17/2025. (SPOLTORE, LESLIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B