Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-54031

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barbara Ellis-Monro
Case #: 1:25-ap-05070
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dennis Lee Keen
3204 Legends Drive
Canton, GA 30114
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Heller
J. M. Heller, Attorney At Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Linda Carol Keen
3204 Legends Drive
Canton, GA 30114
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Heller
J. M. Heller, Attorney At Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Kern
Represented By
Teresa Pardinas
Merbaum Law Group PC
contact info
David J. Merbaum
Merbaum Law Group PC
contact info
Benjamin R Keck
Keck Legal, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Kern
Represented By
Teresa Pardinas
Merbaum Law Group PC
contact info
David J. Merbaum
Merbaum Law Group PC
contact info
Benjamin R Keck
Keck Legal, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Sunday, May 04, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Mon 05/05 12:44 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 4 pgs notice Order and Notice Fri 05/02 2:48 PM
Order and Notice of Rule 26(f) Conference. Service by BNC. Entered on 5/2/2025. Related [+] (mrw)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/02 10:42 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Jeffrey M. Heller on behalf of Dennis Lee Keen, Linda Carol Keen. Related [+] (Heller, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 misc 0-Certificate of Service Mon 04/21 11:44 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Benjamin R Keck on behalf of Jessica Kern, Matthew Kern. Related [+] (Keck, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Fri 04/18 11:37 AM
Summons Issued on Dennis Lee Keen Answer Due 05/19/2025; Linda Carol Keen Answer Due 05/19/2025 (mrw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 8:59 PM
Adversary case 25-05070 Complaint against Dennis Lee Keen, Linda Carol Keen , Fee Collected $ 350 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) 41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)) Filed by Matthew Kern, Jessica Kern (Keck, Benjamin)
Related: [-]