Arizona District Court
Judge:G Murray Snow
Case #: 2:25-cv-01295
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 11:06 AM MST
Defendant
Suns Legacy Partners LLC
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Sheree D Wright
Ibf Law Group Pllc - Phoenix
contact info
Cortney Walters
Law Office Of Cortney E Walters PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 04/30 4:25 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Cortney Walters on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/29 10:35 AM
ORDER/NOTICE directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 18, 2025. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff also serve a copy of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously (Doc.6 ) upon Defendant. Signed by Senior District Judge G Murray Snow on 4/28/2025. (REK)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Tue 04/29 10:32 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior District Judge G Murray Snow on 4/28/2025. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/28 7:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 25-1295 PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Mon 04/28 7:23 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 7:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Suns Legacy Partners LLC. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/18 11:27 AM
EX PARTE First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously by Jane Doe.(Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
5 5 service Summons Submitted Fri 04/18 11:12 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Jane Doe. (Wright, Sheree)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:2 Summons Submitted filed by Jane Doe. The submitted form cannot be issued because it is incomplete. The law firm information is missing from the bottom portion of the form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit a revised summons using the following: Civil, Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Submitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 04/18 10:58 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24202269. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-01295 PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 service Summons Submitted Fri 04/18 10:57 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Jane Doe. (submitted by Sheree Wright) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24202269 filed by Jane Doe. (submitted by Sheree Wright)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Fri 04/18 10:59 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:2 Summons Submitted filed by Jane Doe. The submitted form cannot be issued because it is incomplete. The law firm information is missing from the bottom portion of the form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit a revised summons using the following: Civil, Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Submitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]