California Southern District Court
Judge:Roger T Benitez
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:25-cv-00923
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 11:06 AM PDT
Defendant
A Place for Rover, Inc.
Defendant
Blackstone, Inc.
Defendant
Does 1-50
Defendant
Rover Group, Inc.
Plaintiff
Ana Chernov
Represented By
James B. Drimmer
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Todd D. Carpenter
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 10:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Chernov. Rover Group, Inc. served. (Carpenter, Todd)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 10:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Chernov. A Place for Rover, Inc. served. (Carpenter, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/24 10:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Chernov. Blackstone, Inc. served. (Carpenter, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 10:45 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) (rmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Blackstone, Inc.; A Place for Rover, Inc.; Rover Group, Inc.; Does 1-50 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19810432.), filed by Ana Chernov. The new case number is 3:25-cv-923-BEN-MSB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Carpenter, Todd)(axc1) (rmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jurisdiction