New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Samantha D Elliott
Referred: Talesha L Saint-Marc
Case #: 1:25-cv-00156
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 2:09 PM EDT
Defendant
US Department of Homeland Security
Defendant
US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary
Defendant
US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Defendant
US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Acting Director
Defendant
US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director
Defendant
US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Manchester Sub-Field Office
Plaintiff
Haoyang An
Represented By
SangYeob Kim
American Civil Liberties Union Of New Hampshire
contact info
Plaintiff
Likhith Babu Gorrela
Represented By
SangYeob Kim
American Civil Liberties Union Of New Hampshire
contact info
Plaintiff
Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli
Represented By
SangYeob Kim
American Civil Liberties Union Of New Hampshire
contact info
Plaintiff
Manikanta Pasula
Represented By
SangYeob Kim
American Civil Liberties Union Of New Hampshire
contact info
Plaintiff
Hangrui Zhang
Represented By
SangYeob Kim
American Civil Liberties Union Of New Hampshire
contact info


Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
29 29 misc Transcript Mon 05/19 8:46 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Motion Hearing held on May 7, 2025. Court Reporter: Liza Dubois, Telephone # 603 225-1442. Transcript is available for public inspection, but may not be copied or otherwise reproduced, at the Clerk's Office for a period of 90 days. Additionally, only attorneys of record and pro se parties with an ECF login and password who purchase a transcript from the court reporter will have access to the transcript through PACER during this 90-day period. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number. NOTICE: Any party who requests an original transcript has 21 days from service of this notice to determine whether it is necessary to redact any personal identifiers and, if so, to electronically file a Redaction Request. Redaction Request Follow Up 6/9/2025. Redacted Transcript Follow Up 6/20/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2025.(vln)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Extend Time Mon 05/19 7:51 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 28 Motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
28 28 3 pgs motion Extend Time Fri 05/16 6:35 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Acting Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Manchester Sub-Field Office.(Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
27 27 service Affidavit of Service Wed 05/14 1:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summonses, and ECF Notice as to All Defendants filed by Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang, Haoyang An. Served/Mailed on 4/22/2025. Answer Follow Up on 5/13/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Kim, SangYeob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A_Proof of Service - ICE HQ,
Att: 2 Exhibit B_Proof of Service - Acting ICE Direc.,
Att: 3 Exhibit C_Proof of Service - ICE Manchester Sub-Field Office,
Att: 4 Exhibit D_Proof of Service - ICE Boston Field Office,
Att: 5 Exhibit E_Proof of Service - Sec. of DHS,
Att: 6 Exhibit F_Proof of Service - DHS HQ,
Att: 7 Exhibit G_Proof of Service - DOJ AG,
Att: 8 Exhibit F_Proof of Service - Service Receipt
Thursday, May 08, 2025
26 26 misc Stipulation Thu 05/08 5:36 AM
STIPULATION re4 MOTION to Certify Class re: REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (JOINT) by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang(Bissonnette, Gilles)
Related: [-]
order Endorsed Order - not on motion Thu 05/08 11:16 AM
ENDORSED ORDER approving 26 Stipulation. Text of Order: Approved. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
25 25 notice Notice - Other Wed 05/07 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Filing Declarations of James Hicks and Andre Watson by US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Acting Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Manchester Sub-Field Office.(Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 May 5, 2025 Declaration of James Hicks,
Att: 2 May 6, 2025 Declaration of Andre Watson
24 24 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 05/07 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alessandra Faso on behalf of US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Acting Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Manchester Sub-Field Office Attorney Alessandra Faso added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Alessandra Faso added to party US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary(pty:dft), Attorney Alessandra Faso added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Alessandra Faso added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Acting Director(pty:dft), Attorney Alessandra Faso added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director(pty:dft), Attorney Alessandra Faso added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Manchester Sub-Field Office(pty:dft).(Faso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Wed 05/07 1:45 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Samantha D. Elliott: MOTION HEARING held on 5/7/2025 re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (expedited) . Motion denied for the reasons explained on the record. (Court Reporter: Liza Dubois) (Pltfs Atty: Giles Bissonette, SangYeob Kim, Ron Abramson) (Defts Atty: Glenn Matthew Girdharry)(Total Hearing Time: 3:15) (vln)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
23 23 respm Reply to Objection to Motion Mon 05/05 6:11 PM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (expedited) filed by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang. Surreply due by 5/12/2025.(Kim, SangYeob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Second Supplemental Affidavit of Attorney SangYeob Kim,
Att: 2 Exhibit UU_Email for Potential Stipulation,
Att: 3 Exhibit VV_SEVIS Record Event History,
Att: 4 Exhibit WW_Potential New SEVP Policy,
Att: 5 Exhibit XX_Northern Georgia District Court Preliminary Injunction Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit YY_Plaintiff Zhang's Expired Visa,
Att: 7 Exhibit ZZ_Plaintiff An's Visa Revocation,
Att: 8 Exhibit AAA_Plaintiff An's SEVIS Previous Termination Screenshot
Friday, May 02, 2025
22 22 notice Attorney Appearance Fri 05/02 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Zimmerman on behalf of Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang Attorney Heather Zimmerman added to party Haoyang An(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Zimmerman added to party Likhith Babu Gorrela(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Zimmerman added to party Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Zimmerman added to party Manikanta Pasula(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Zimmerman added to party Hangrui Zhang(pty:pla).(Zimmerman, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
21 21 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/01 9:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (expedited) filed by US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Acting Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Manchester Sub-Field Office. Follow up on Reply on 5/8/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Girdharry, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Prints of Active SEVIS records,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Watson Declaration from Liu v. Noem, 25-cv-133-SE-TSM
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
20 20 notice Attorney Appearance Tue 04/29 9:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fermin L Arraiza-Navas on behalf of Manikanta Pasula Attorney Fermin L Arraiza-Navas added to party Manikanta Pasula(pty:pla).(Arraiza-Navas, Fermin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 notice Attorney Appearance Mon 04/28 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary L. Heiden on behalf of Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang Attorney Zachary L. Heiden added to party Haoyang An(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary L. Heiden added to party Likhith Babu Gorrela(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary L. Heiden added to party Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary L. Heiden added to party Manikanta Pasula(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary L. Heiden added to party Hangrui Zhang(pty:pla).(Heiden, Zachary)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Attorney Appearance Mon 04/28 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lynette J. Labinger on behalf of Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang Attorney Lynette J. Labinger added to party Haoyang An(pty:pla), Attorney Lynette J. Labinger added to party Likhith Babu Gorrela(pty:pla), Attorney Lynette J. Labinger added to party Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli(pty:pla), Attorney Lynette J. Labinger added to party Manikanta Pasula(pty:pla), Attorney Lynette J. Labinger added to party Hangrui Zhang(pty:pla).(Labinger, Lynette)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 10:27 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Motion for Zachary Heiden to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 13 Motion for Heather Zimmerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 14 Motion Lynette Labinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 15 Motion Fermin L. Arraiza-Navas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott. The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(vln)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
17 17 notice Attorney Appearance Fri 04/25 6:09 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Glenn Matthew Girdharry on behalf of US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Acting Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Manchester Sub-Field Office Attorney Glenn Matthew Girdharry added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn Matthew Girdharry added to party US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn Matthew Girdharry added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn Matthew Girdharry added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Acting Director(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn Matthew Girdharry added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn Matthew Girdharry added to party US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Manchester Sub-Field Office(pty:dft).(Girdharry, Glenn)
Related: [-]
notice Motion Hearing Fri 04/25 11:38 AM
NOTICE re:5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (expedited) Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Exceed Fri 04/25 11:40 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
Related: [-]
motion Exceed Fri 04/25 11:45 AM
JOINT to MOTION to Exceed Page Limit by US Department of Homeland Security(vln)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Exceed Fri 04/25 11:46 AM
ORAL ORDER granting [] JOINT Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 04/25 12:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Samantha D. Elliott. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2025. Proposed briefing schedule adopted. Defendants' opposition to5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 5/1/2025; Plaintiffs' reply to Defendants' opposition brief due by 5/5/2025; Oral argument on5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 5/7/2025 at 9 am. Defendants' Objection to4 Motion to Certify Class due by 5/9/2025; May 7; Plaintiffs' Reply due by 5/13/2025. Joint Motion to exceed page limit by 10 pages GRANTED. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock) (Pltfs Atty: Giles Bissonette, SangYeob Kim, Ron Abramson, Fermin L. Arraiza-Navas, Lynette Labinger, Heather Zimmerman) (Defts Atty: Glenn Matthew Girdharry)(Total Hearing Time: 0:30) (vln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
16 16 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 04/24 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chelsea Eddy on behalf of Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang Attorney Chelsea Eddy added to party Haoyang An(pty:pla), Attorney Chelsea Eddy added to party Likhith Babu Gorrela(pty:pla), Attorney Chelsea Eddy added to party Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli(pty:pla), Attorney Chelsea Eddy added to party Manikanta Pasula(pty:pla), Attorney Chelsea Eddy added to party Hangrui Zhang(pty:pla).(Eddy, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 8:24 AM
MOTION for Fermin L. Arraiza-Navas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (UNOPPOSED) (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2627679.) filed by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang.Follow up on Objection on 5/8/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 8:22 AM
MOTION for Lynette Labinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (UNOPPOSED) (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2627678.) filed by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang.Follow up on Objection on 5/8/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 8:21 AM
MOTION for Heather Zimmerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (UNOPPOSED) (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2627676.) filed by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang.Follow up on Objection on 5/8/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 8:19 AM
MOTION for Zachary Heiden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (UNOPPOSED) (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2627672.) filed by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang.Follow up on Objection on 5/8/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 misc Addendum Wed 04/23 1:43 PM
Addendum/ to5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (expedited) for Second Additional Exhibit (Exhibit TT) by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang.(Kim, SangYeob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) TT_Affidavit of Attorney Daniel Oldenburg
10 10 misc Addendum Wed 04/23 9:41 AM
Addendum/ to5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (expedited) for Additional Exhibits by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang.(Kim, SangYeob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Supplemental Affidavit of Attorney SangYeob Kim,
Att: 2 Exhibit MM_Email from Rivier University,
Att: 3 Exhibit NN_Updated Expert Declaration - Dahlia French,
Att: 4 Exhibit OO_Updated SEVIS Record - Gummadavelli,
Att: 5 Exhibit PP_OPT Receipt and I-20 for Gorrela,
Att: 6 Exhibit QQ_H-1B Denial Example,
Att: 7 Exhibit RR_Email from Dartmouth (for Xiaotian Liu),
Att: 8 Exhibit (Affidavit) SS_Affidavit of Non-party Dartmouth Student
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance Mon 04/21 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carol Garvan on behalf of Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang Attorney Carol Garvan added to party Haoyang An(pty:pla), Attorney Carol Garvan added to party Likhith Babu Gorrela(pty:pla), Attorney Carol Garvan added to party Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli(pty:pla), Attorney Carol Garvan added to party Manikanta Pasula(pty:pla), Attorney Carol Garvan added to party Hangrui Zhang(pty:pla).(Garvan, Carol)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons - Waiver Issued Mon 04/21 9:03 AM
Summons issued electronically as to US Department of Homeland Security. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF
order Order Mon 04/21 9:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER re 1 Complaint. Text of Order: On April 7, 2025, a student filed case number 25-cv-133 challenging a change to his SEVIS record made by the Department of Homeland Security. That case was randomly assigned to District Judge Samantha D. Elliott and Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. This case, 25-cv-156, is a class action on behalf of other students also challenging changes to their SEVIS records made by the Department of Homeland Security. Because this case raises the same issues as in 25-cv-133, this case shall be reassigned to District Judge Samantha D. Elliott and Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc in the interest of judicial economy. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
Related: [-]
utility Case Reassigned Mon 04/21 9:35 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott. The new case designation is: 1:25-cv-00156-SE. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(ko)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance Sun 04/20 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald L. Abramson on behalf of Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang Attorney Ronald L. Abramson added to party Haoyang An(pty:pla), Attorney Ronald L. Abramson added to party Likhith Babu Gorrela(pty:pla), Attorney Ronald L. Abramson added to party Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli(pty:pla), Attorney Ronald L. Abramson added to party Manikanta Pasula(pty:pla), Attorney Ronald L. Abramson added to party Hangrui Zhang(pty:pla).(Abramson, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 motion Exceed Fri 04/18 4:53 PM
Assented to MOTION to Exceed Page Limit of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Law in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang.(Kim, SangYeob)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 04/18 2:59 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (expedited) filed by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 5/2/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Kim, SangYeob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Attorney SangYeob Kim,
Att: 4 Exhibit A_Affidavit of Manikanta Pasula,
Att: 5 Exhibit B_SEVIS termination notice of Manikanta Pasula,
Att: 6 Exhibit C_Visa revocation notice of Manikanta Pasula,
Att: 7 Exhibit D_Criminal record of Manikanta Pasula,
Att: 8 Exhibit E_Affidavit of Likhith Babu Gorrela,
Att: 9 Exhibit F_SEVIS termination notice of Likhith Babu Gorrela,
Att: 10 Exhibit G_Visa revocation notice of Likhith Babu Gorrela,
Att: 11 Exhibit H_Criminal Record of Likhith Babu Gorrela,
Att: 12 Exhibit I_Affidavit of Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli,
Att: 13 Exhibit J_SEVIS termination notice of Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli,
Att: 14 Exhibit K_Visa revocation notice of Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli,
Att: 15 Exhibit L_Criminal record of Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli,
Att: 16 Exhibit M_Affidavit of Hangrui Zhang,
Att: 17 Exhibit N_SEVIS termination notice of Hangrui Zhang,
Att: 18 Exhibit O_Criminal record of Hangrui Zhang,
Att: 19 Exhibit P_Affidavit of Haoyang An,
Att: 20 Exhibit Q_SEVIS termination notice of Haoyang An,
Att: 21 Exhibit R_Criminal record of Haoyang An,
Att: 22 Exhibit S_Expert Declaration Attorney Dahlia French,
Att: 23 Exhibit T_Declaration of Attorney Emily White,
Att: 24 Exhibit U_Affidavit of Attorney Stephanie Elona Young Marzouk,
Att: 25 Exhibit V_ICE Policy Guidance 1004-04 Visa Revocations,
Att: 26 Exhibit W_Guidance Directive 2016-03 9 FAM 403.11-3 Visa Revocation,
Att: 27 Exhibit X_NHPR News Article,
Att: 28 Exhibit Y_CBS8 News Article,
Att: 29 Exhibit Z_Boston.com News Article,
Att: 30 Exhibit AA_DHS SEVIS Website Termination Reasons (dated Dec. 3, 2024),
Att: 31 Exhibit BB_DHS SEVIS Website Termination Reasons (dated Apr. 9, 2025),
Att: 32 Exhibit CC_DHS SEVIS Website Terminate a Student (dated Nov. 7, 2024),
Att: 33 Exhibit DD_DHS SEVIS Website Terminate or Reactive a Dependent Record (dated Mar. 17, 2023),
Att: 34 Exhibit EE_Affidavit of Xiaotian Liu and Attachments,
Att: 35 Exhibit FF_NAFSA Article,
Att: 36 Exhibit GG_Boston Globe Article,
Att: 37 Exhibit HH_Inside Higher Ed. Article,
Att: 38 Exhibit II_USCIS STEM OPT,
Att: 39 Exhibit JJ_Wu TRO,
Att: 40 Exhibit KK_Isserdasani TRO,
Att: 41 Exhibit LL_Roe TRO
4 4 7 pgs motion Certify Class Fri 04/18 2:45 PM
MOTION to Certify Class filed by Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 5/2/2025. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Kim, SangYeob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A_Affidavit of Attorney Gilles Bissonnette,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
3 3 service Summons - Waiver Issued Fri 04/18 2:33 PM
Summonses issued electronically as to US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Acting Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Manchester Sub-Field Office. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF
2 2 notice Attorney Appearance Fri 04/18 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilles R. Bissonnette on behalf of Haoyang An, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Haoyang An(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Likhith Babu Gorrela(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Manikanta Pasula(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Hangrui Zhang(pty:pla).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint - New Case Fri 04/18 1:28 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BNHDC-2625562 filed by Thanuj Kumar Gummadavelli, Likhith Babu Gorrela, Manikanta Pasula, Hangrui Zhang, Haoyang An.(Kim, SangYeob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons - Waiver DHS - HQ,
Att: 3 Summons - Waiver DHS - Secretary,
Att: 4 Summons - Waiver ICE - Boston,
Att: 5 Summons - Waiver ICE - Director,
Att: 6 Summons - Waiver ICE - HQ,
Att: 7 Summons - Waiver ICE - Manchester
utility Case Assigned Fri 04/18 2:22 PM
Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante and US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. The case designation is: 25-cv-156-JL-TSM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (jmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - ECF Fri 04/18 2:23 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (jmb)
Related: [-]