New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:25-cv-02866
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
RX WAREHOUSE PHARMACY INC.
Defendant
KLEIN PHARMACY INC.
Defendant
JAYNE KOPACKI
Defendant
MATTHEW KOPACKI
Defendant
LAKE CARMEL RX INC.
Defendant
MIDLAND PHARMACY LLC
Defendant
MOUNT PROSPECT PHARMACEUTICAL SERVICES INC. d/b/a LISS PHARMACY
Defendant
LINDA PARISI
Defendant
MATTHEW JOSEPH PARISI, JR.,
Defendant
PROHEALTH DRUGS, INC.
Defendant
MOHAMMED A. RAHMAN
Defendant
SYED RIZVI
Defendant
AAA GPO INC.
Defendant
MASOODA AKHTER SHAREEF
Defendant
SADATHULLA SHAREEF
Defendant
HOWARD SHULMAN
Defendant
SHUMET INC. d/b/a KEANSBURG DRUGS
Defendant
DAVID STAHLBERGER
Defendant
STAYWELL PHARMACY
Defendant
SRINIVAS TALLA
Defendant
MOHAMMED ULLAH
Defendant
UPTMAX HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC. d/b/a ALAMO PHARMACY
Defendant
SREEDHAR VAJINEPALLI
Defendant
WERBAK INC. d/b/a POMPTON PHARMACY
Defendant
NADEEM KAUSAR
Defendant
AAA DRUGS INC.
Defendant
ALEKYA CORPORATION d/b/a HEALTH CARE PHARMACY
Defendant
ROBERT JAMES AUTREY
Defendant
BALDWIN PHARMACY LLC
Defendant
DIMPLE BHUVA BHALODIA
Defendant
BMRR CORPORATION d/b/a HELLER'S PHARMACY
Defendant
BROWNSVILLE CENTRAL RX LLC d/b/a AUTREY PHARMACY 1
Defendant
BROWNSVILLE PHARMACY 2 LLC d/b/a AUTREY PHARMACY 2
Defendant
BROWNSVILLE PHARMACY 3 LLC d/b/a AUTREY PHARMACY 3
Defendant
BROWNSVILLE PHARMACY 4 LLC D/B/A AUTREY PHARMACY 4
Defendant
ESSGEE PHILLIPSBURG CORPORATION d/b/a PHILLIPSBURG PHARMACY
Defendant
LASZLO FARKAS
Defendant
ROBERT FLANNELLY
Defendant
FRY PHARMACY LLC d/b/a FRY'S PRESCRIPTION PHARMACY
Defendant
SRINIVAS GADIRAJU
Defendant
HARLINGEN PHARMACY
Defendant
HAVERSTRAW DRUGS LLC d/b/a CARE RX PHARMACY
Defendant
HOMECARE PLUS
Defendant
JEWEL OF FLUSHING RX
Defendant
JNR PHARMACY BREWSTER INC.
Defendant
LOKESWARA KALAKOTI
Defendant
ZINOVY KERZHNER
Plaintiff
SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By
STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Blank, Rome LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 3 pgs misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Tue 04/29 2:07 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 04/29 2:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. identifying Sun Pharmaceutical Holdings USA, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ASIA ODESSA LIVINGSTONE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. (LIVINGSTONE, ASIA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 12:11 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to AAA DRUGS INC., AAA GPO INC., ALEKYA CORPORATION, ROBERT JAMES AUTREY, BALDWIN PHARMACY LLC, DIMPLE BHUVA BHALODIA, BMRR CORPORATION, BROWNSVILLE CENTRAL RX LLC, BROWNSVILLE PHARMACY 2 LLC, BROWNSVILLE PHARMACY 3 LLC, BROWNSVILLE PHARMACY 4 LLC, ESSGEE PHILLIPSBURG CORPORATION, LASZLO FARKAS, ROBERT FLANNELLY, FRY PHARMACY LLC, SRINIVAS GADIRAJU, HARLINGEN PHARMACY, HAVERSTRAW DRUGS LLC, HOMECARE PLUS, JEWEL OF FLUSHING RX, JNR PHARMACY BREWSTER INC., LOKESWARA KALAKOTI, NADEEM KAUSAR, ZINOVY KERZHNER, KLEIN PHARMACY INC., JAYNE KOPACKI, MATTHEW KOPACKI, LAKE CARMEL RX INC., MIDLAND PHARMACY LLC, MOUNT PROSPECT PHARMACEUTICAL SERVICES INC., LINDA PARISI, MATTHEW JOSEPH PARISI, JR.,, PROHEALTH DRUGS, INC., MOHAMMED A. RAHMAN, SYED RIZVI, RX WAREHOUSE PHARMACY INC., MASOODA AKHTER SHAREEF, SADATHULLA SHAREEF, HOWARD SHULMAN, SHUMET INC., DAVID STAHLBERGER, STAYWELL PHARMACY, SRINIVAS TALLA, MOHAMMED ULLAH, UPTMAX HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC., SREEDHAR VAJINEPALLI, WERBAK INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/21 10:43 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS radio button. D/B/A parties should be added as an ALIAS . Please do not enter them in the First or Last Name Fields . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/21 11:49 AM
Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (amv)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Mon 04/21 11:50 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 90 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16184275) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC..(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet