Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter C Mckittrick
Case #: 3:25-bk-31290
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Cortex North America Corporation
4103 SE International Way Ste 305
Portland, OR 97222-8854
Represented By
THEODORE J PITEO
Michael D. O'Brien & Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
1220 SW 3rd Ave., Rm. 315
Portland, OR 97204


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Fri 04/25 9:10 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:20 Order Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2025 at 01:30PM by Zoom - PCM: Meeting ID 161 786 6635, Passcode 141482, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Case Management Documents Due By 05/21/2025. (rrh). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 11:37 AM
Certificate of Service21 Order Fixing Time for Acceptances or Rejections of Plan Filed By Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 11:10 AM
Superseded by ECF No.26 Certificate of Service21 Order Fixing Time for Acceptances or Rejections of Plan Filed By Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)Modified on 4/25/2025 (krw)
Related: [-]
24 24 4 pgs order Use Cash Collateral Fri 04/25 7:54 AM
Interim Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and Authorizing Grant of Replacement Lien re:13 Motion To Use Cash Collateral (krw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 court xBNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Thu 04/24 9:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice of17 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines with Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee, Portland. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/21/2025 at 11:30 AM via 341 Meeting via Telephone (UST). Dial 866-564-0532, passcode 8835427. Proofs of Claims due by 06/27/2025. (Schaffer, Amy). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
22 22 15 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral [Requires LBF 541 - 2/28/25; LBF 541.1 - 2/28/25] Wed 04/23 12:38 PM
Notice of Final Hearing and Motion For Authority to Conditionally Use Cash Collateral and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Debtor Cortex North America Corporation Hearing Scheduled for 5/9/2025 at 01:00 PM in/by Zoom - PCM: Meeting ID 161 786 6635, Passcode 141482, Phone 1-669-254-5252.. (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Fixing Time for Acceptances or Rejections of Plan Wed 04/23 12:36 PM
Order Fixing Time for Acceptances or Rejections of Plan. Theodore J Piteo is directed to serve this order along with any related documents and required attachments on the appropriate parties and file a certificate of service within 7 days. Re:12 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE) Confirmation Hearing to be Held on 6/24/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1, Portland. Certificate of Service due 4/30/2025. (rrh)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Setting Case Management Conference Wed 04/23 12:26 PM
Order Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2025 at 01:30PM by Zoom - PCM: Meeting ID 161 786 6635, Passcode 141482, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Case Management Documents Due By 05/21/2025. (rrh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
19 19 audio PDF with Audio Attached - CourtSpeak Tue 04/22 9:35 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [04/22/2025 02:30:09 PM]. File Size [ 5681 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:24:30 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
18 18 court CHAP ME Generic Hearing Continued/Held - CHAP Tue 04/22 3:55 PM
Hearing Held. Re:13 Preliminary Hearing and Motion For Authority to Conditionally Use Cash Collateral and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Debtor Cortex North America Corporation. (rrh)
Related: [-]
17 17 court Notice of Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11/12 Tue 04/22 3:24 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines with Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee, Portland. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/21/2025 at 11:30 AM via 341 Meeting via Telephone (UST). Dial 866-564-0532, passcode 8835427. Proofs of Claims due by 06/27/2025. (Schaffer, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
16 16 notice Notice Appointing Trustee Mon 04/21 9:19 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee. Kenneth S Eiler added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee, Portland. (Steven, Heather)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sun 04/20 9:07 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:8 Order and Notice Regarding Time to File Documents; and Notice of Proposed Dismissal. (emb). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sun 04/20 9:07 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:9 Order of Designation, and Notice of Chapter 11 Financial Reporting and Mailing Requirements Monthly Operating Report due by 5/21/2025. (emb). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
13 13 motion Use Cash Collateral [Requires LBF 541 - 2/28/25; LBF 541.1 - 2/28/25] Fri 04/18 4:30 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing and Motion For Authority to Conditionally Use Cash Collateral and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Debtor Cortex North America Corporation Hearing Scheduled for 4/22/2025 at 02:30 PM in/by Zoom - PCM: Meeting ID 161 786 6635, Passcode 141482, Phone 1-669-254-5252.. (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
12 12 plan Chapter 11 Plan (incl. small business and subV) Fri 04/18 4:27 PM
Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Statement No Documents Re 1116 Filed or Prepared Fri 04/18 4:20 PM
Statement that No Documents Required by USC 1116 Have Been Filed or Prepared Filed By Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Tax Documents Fri 04/18 4:19 PM
Federal Tax Documents for the Year for 2024 Filed By Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Designation/Monthly Operating Reports Fri 04/18 1:20 PM
Order of Designation, and Notice of Chapter 11 Financial Reporting and Mailing Requirements Monthly Operating Report due by 5/21/2025. (emb)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order and Notice Re: Time to File Documents Fri 04/18 1:13 PM
Order and Notice Regarding Time to File Documents; and Notice of Proposed Dismissal. (emb)
Related: [-]
7 7 14 pgs motion Employ [LBF 1114 - 12/1/22 may apply] Fri 04/18 12:58 PM
Application to Employ Attorneys for Debtors in Possession and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/18 12:21 PM
Certificate of Service3 List of Creditors with 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed By Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 04/18 12:19 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed By Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 04/18 12:17 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed By Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc List of Creditors with 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Fri 04/18 12:13 PM
List of Creditors with 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed By Debtor Cortex North America Corporation (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 04/18 11:19 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Attorney Ch 11 Voluntary Petition([LINK 25-31290 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A22357594. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 34 pgs misc Attorney Ch 11 Voluntary Petition Fri 04/18 10:57 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/17/2025. (PITEO, THEODORE)
Related: [-]