California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:25-cv-03442
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 12:11 PM PDT
Movant
JESSICA CORTEZ
Movant
MARIA MEZA
Plaintiff
National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By
Karel Rocha
Prenovost Normandin Dawe And Rocha
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/23 8:43 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/23 8:41 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Jessica Cortez and Maria Meza. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/22 6:54 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/22 6:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/22 6:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 04/21 9:58 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Rocha, Karel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/21 9:56 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying American International Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Rocha, Karel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/18 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39535162 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attorney Karel Rocha added to party National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA(pty:pla))(Rocha, Karel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet