Ground Pounders, Inc. v. Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline M Deluca |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-03097 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 2:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Ground Pounders, Inc.
1001 17th Street #1150
Denver, CO 80202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Matthew E. Stalcup on behalf of Plaintiff Ground Pounders, Inc..(Stalcup, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to defendant Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (RMR) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Requested as to Motorist Commercial Insurance Company regarding Complaint,1 . (Stalcup, Matthew) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/18 12:01 PM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Ground Pounders, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMR) |
|
2 | 2
oth_evt
Assignment of Judges
Fri 04/18 11:59 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (RMR) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with jury demand against Motorists Commercial Mutual Insurance Company, dba Motorists Insurance, dba Encova ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5303486), by Attorney Matthew E. Stalcup on behalf of Ground Pounders, Inc.(Stalcup, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |