Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 3:25-bk-03438
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 20, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Talking Rock Land, LLC
15075 N Talking Rock Ranch Rd
Prescott, AZ 86305-5681
Represented By
SCOTT B. COHEN
Engelman Berger, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ZCHAPTER 11 FMC
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
29 29 3 pgs notice Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of) Wed 04/30 2:29 PM
Notice of Bar Date [Notice of Filing Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay and Notice of Hearing on and Bar Date for Objections Thereto] filed by ANTHONY P. CALI of Stinson LLP on behalf of Bryan C. Croll as Trustee of The Stacey C. Croll 2005 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated June 7 2005, Bryan C. Croll as Trustee of The Steven F. Croll 2005 Gift Trust U/A/D Dated June 14, 2005, Derek O. Reiber as Trustee of The Reiber Gift Trust U/T/A Dated December 15, 2012, Inscription Canyon Ranch, L.P., Johanna Svenson Croll as Trustee of The Bryan Croll 2012 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated December 28, 2012, Kerry Lynn Croll as Trustee of The Steven Croll 2012 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated December 11, 2012, Stacey C. Croll as Trustee of the Bryan C. Croll 2005 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated June 17, 2005 Related [+] Objections/Responses due by 5/14/2025,.(CALI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-] 28 Motion for Relief from Stay (199.00 fee)
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
28 28 15 pgs motion Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee) Tue 04/29 6:27 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (199.00 fee) [Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Re: State Court Litigation] filed by ANTHONY P. CALI of Stinson LLP on behalf of Bryan C. Croll as Trustee of The Stacey C. Croll 2005 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated June 7 2005, Bryan C. Croll as Trustee of The Steven F. Croll 2005 Gift Trust U/A/D Dated June 14, 2005, Derek O. Reiber as Trustee of The Reiber Gift Trust U/T/A Dated December 15, 2012, Inscription Canyon Ranch, L.P., Johanna Svenson Croll as Trustee of The Bryan Croll 2012 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated December 28, 2012, Kerry Lynn Croll as Trustee of The Steven Croll 2012 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated December 11, 2012, Stacey C. Croll as Trustee of the Bryan C. Croll 2005 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated June 17, 2005. (CALI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 97 pgs Exhibit A-B
Att: 2 60 pgs Exhibit C-L
27 27 3 pgs notice Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of) Tue 04/29 4:19 PM
Notice of Bar Date to Respond to Debtor's Motion to Approve Authority to Sell Real Property in the Ordinary Course filed by PATRICK A. CLISHAM of ENGELMAN BERGER PC on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC Objections/Responses due by 5/23/2025,.(CLISHAM, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A
26 26 6 pgs motion Approve (Motion to) Tue 04/29 3:45 PM
Motion to Approve Authority to Sell Real Property in the Ordinary Course filed by PATRICK A. CLISHAM of ENGELMAN BERGER PC on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC. (CLISHAM, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Tue 04/29 6:28 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (199.00 fee)([LINK:3:25-bk-03438-DPC] ) [motion,185] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A37455258. Fee amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order oEmploy (Application to) Mon 04/28 5:21 PM
ORDER Granting Application to Employ Related [+] signed on 4/28/2025 . (FXG)
Related: [-] 18
24 24 1 pgs court Deficiency Memo (QC Form) Mon 04/28 8:04 AM
Deficiency Memo Related [+] (WES)
Related: [-] 21 Notice of Appearance
Friday, April 25, 2025
23 23 court zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Sun 04/27 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part
22 22 other Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/25 3:14 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC. Related [+] (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
21 21 notice Appearance (Notice of) Fri 04/25 2:17 PM
Initial Notice of Appearance filed by JON A TITUS of Frazer Ryan Goldberg & Arnold LLP on behalf of Harvard Investments, Inc. a Nevada corporation.(TITUS, JON)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Fri 04/25 1:32 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Employment of Himmelstein & Adkins, LLC as Special Counsel for the Debtor filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC Related [+].(COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-] 18 Application to Employ,19 Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014
19 19 4 pgs other Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014 Fri 04/25 1:28 PM
Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014 Verified Statement of David E. Shein in Support of Debtor's Application for Order Authorizing Employment of Himmelstein & Adkins, LLC as Special Counsel for Debtor filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC. Related [+] (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-] 18 Application to Employ
18 18 8 pgs motion Employ (Application to) Fri 04/25 1:21 PM
Application to Employ Debtor's: (1) Application for Order Authorizing Employment of Himmelstein & Adkins, LLC as Special Counsel for the Debtor; and (2) Bankruptcy Rule 2014(a) Statement filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC. (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs other List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 04/25 12:26 PM
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC. (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs court BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part Fri 04/25 10:35 AM
Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 02:00 PM via Telephonic Hearing (341) (WES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
15 15 5 pgs other Declaration Thu 04/24 4:25 PM
Declaration -Mailing List Declaration filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC. (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs notice Appearance (Notice of) Thu 04/24 2:52 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by ALAN A. MEDA of Burch & Cracchiolo PA on behalf of Harvard Investments, Inc. a Nevada corporation.(MEDA, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 04/23 4:35 PM
Adversary case 3:25-ap-00137. Notice of Removal (350.00 fee) filed by Inscription Canyon Ranch, L.P.. Nature of Suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause) Notice of Removal of Lawsuit Pending in Maricopa County Superior Court to United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Arizona . (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/23 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/23 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
10 10 2 pgs notice Appearance (Notice of) Mon 04/21 5:21 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by ALISA C. LACEY of STINSON LLP on behalf of Derek O. Reiber as Trustee of The Reiber Gift Trust U/T/A Dated December 15, 2012, Kerry Lynn Croll as Trustee of The Steven Croll 2012 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated December 11, 2012, Johanna Svenson Croll as Trustee of The Bryan Croll 2012 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated December 28, 2012, Bryan C. Croll as Trustee of The Steven F. Croll 2005 Gift Trust U/A/D Dated June 14, 2005, Bryan C. Croll as Trustee of The Stacey C. Croll 2005 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated June 7 2005, Stacey C. Croll as Trustee of the Bryan C. Croll 2005 Gift Trust U/T/A Dated June 17, 2005, Inscription Canyon Ranch, L.P..(LACEY, ALISA)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance (Notice of) Mon 04/21 1:23 PM
Notice of Appearance & Request for Notices filed by JENNIFER A. GIAIMO of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(GIAIMO, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
8 8 order oChapter 11 Status Conference (DPC Form) Mon 04/21 8:48 AM
ORDER Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference signed on 4/21/2025 Hearing set for 5/20/2025 at 03:30 PM as a Videoconference Hearing . (RSB)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs court Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form) Mon 04/21 8:19 AM
Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed. (WES)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 order oEmploy (Application to) Mon 04/21 7:48 AM
ORDER Granting Application to Employ Related [+] signed on 4/18/2025 . (WES)
Related: [-] 3
5 5 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Fri 04/18 2:01 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Employment of Engelman Berger, P.C. as Debtor's Counsel filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC Related [+].(COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-] 3 Application to Employ
4 4 other Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014 Fri 04/18 1:58 PM
Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014 -Verified Statement of Scott B. Cohen in Support of Application to Employ Engelman Berger, P.C. as Debtor's Counsel filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC. Related [+] (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-] 3 Application to Employ
3 3 7 pgs motion Employ (Application to) Fri 04/18 1:57 PM
Application to Employ Engelman Berger, P.C. as Debtor's Counsel filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC. (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Fri 04/18 12:03 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 5/20/2025 at 02:00 PM as a Telephonic Hearing (341). (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs other 2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee) Fri 04/18 12:01 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 05/9/2025, Master Mailing due 04/25/2025, Schedules A/B-J due 05/2/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/2/2025, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 05/2/2025, Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income due by 05/2/2025, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 05/2/2025, filed by SCOTT B. COHEN of ENGELMAN BERGER, P.C. on behalf of Talking Rock Land, LLC (COHEN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Fri 04/18 2:37 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:3:25-bk-03438] ) [other,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A37426358. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]