District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Beryl A Howell
Case #: 1:25-cv-01197
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 4:06 PM EDT
Defendant
ASIF HASSAN
Plaintiff
CLASP
Represented By
Guy G. Brenner
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Branch on behalf of ASIF HASSAN (Branch, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Mon 04/28 12:24 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ASIF HASSAN served on 4/22/2025, answer due 5/13/2025 (Brenner, Guy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order Wed 04/23 9:19 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 23, 2025. (lcbah2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/22 10:30 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ASIF HASSAN.(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/22 10:28 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Mon 04/21 8:50 AM
RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re1 COMPLAINT against ASIF HASSAN ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11628350) filed by CLASP.(Brenner, Guy). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 4/28/2025. (zapb) Modified on 4/21/2025 (zhcn)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Mon 04/21 10:20 AM
RESOLVED.....NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR The following error(s) need correction: Attorney is not an Active bar member. Please refer to the court website for Bar Status Lookup, Attorney Admissions, and Renewal Information at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorneys. (zmtm) Modified on 4/21/2025 (zhcn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Fri 04/18 3:55 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CLASP (Brenner, Guy)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT against ASIF HASSAN ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11628350) filed by CLASP.(Brenner, Guy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 13 Summons