Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Gregory F Vantatenhove
Case #: 5:25-cv-00136
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Case in other court:Fayette Circuit Court, 25-CI-01140
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Patrick Farris
Billings Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Brandon A. Girdley
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, Llp - Louisville
contact info
Sean Gregory Williamson
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, Llp - Louisville
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Represented By
Gregory E. Mayes
Middleton & Reutlinger
contact info
Michael E. Gregory
Greglaw, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry A. Woodall
3208 Honey Hill Lane
Lexington, KY 40502
Represented By
James Hays Lawson
Lawson At Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Terminate Motions ~Util - Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/29 10:12 AM
ORDER: 1. The parties' agreed order6 is GRANTED; and 2. Def Equifax Information Services, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Complaint NLT 5/26/2025. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/28/2025. (KMP)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Terminate Motions ~Util - Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/29 10:09 AM
ORDER: 1. The parties' agreed order4 is GRANTED; 2. Def JPMorgan Chase Bank shall answer or otherwise respond to Complaint NLT 5/9/2025. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/28/2025.(KMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 04/25 12:25 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Foisy, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 04/25 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Kenneth Foisy.6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC has been filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KMP)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/25 9:03 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC(Foisy, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Andrew Foisy on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Foisy, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Fri 04/25 11:43 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC ,4 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 motion Proposed Agreed Order Thu 04/24 10:15 AM
Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Williamson, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 04/18 3:41 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (ADH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/18 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 25-CI-01140. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6079508), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(ADH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Consents for Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Additional Counsel info for Civil Cover Sheet
misc Conflict Check Fri 04/18 3:40 PM
Conflict Check run. (ADH)
Related: [-]