California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:25-cv-03455
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 25STCV06365
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 2:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff
Tiffany Baltrus


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 04/28 3:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., to Standing Orders for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt served on April 28, 2025. (Wooley, Koree)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Wed 04/23 3:45 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-03455 JAK (KESx). (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 04/22 11:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., re Notice (Other)8 served on April 22, 2025. (Wooley, Koree)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 11:46 AM
Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(D) filed by Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc..(Wooley, Koree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Conformed Copy of Notice of Removal to State Court
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 04/21 4:30 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 04/21 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/18 4:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents)4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 served on April 18, 2025. (Wooley, Koree)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/18 2:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 served on April 18, 2025. (Wooley, Koree)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/18 2:31 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. identifying Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. and Alaska Air Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Wooley, Koree)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/18 2:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Wooley, Koree)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/18 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 25STCV06365 Receipt No: ACACDC-39536768 - Fee: $405, filed by Tiffany Baltrus Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.. (Attorney Koree B Wooley added to party Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wooley, Koree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint and Related Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit Answer to Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 04/21 4:38 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Baltrus. Filed in State Court on 3/6/2025 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 04/21 4:41 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. Filed in State Court on 4/16/2025 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal1 .(car)
Related: [-]