California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:25-cv-00954
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Case in other court:San Bernardino Superior Court, CIVSB2504049
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 2:09 PM PDT
Defendant
Aston Carter, Inc.
Defendant
Danny Pham
Defendant
SelectHealth, Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Mark Keegan
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
Sol Mia Taylor


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 04/23 1:26 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/23 12:58 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/22 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/22 12:41 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/22 12:41 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/22 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/18 1:55 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SelectHealth, Inc. SelectHealth, Inc., identifying Intermountain Health. (Keegan, Timothy)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Fri 04/18 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant SelectHealth, Inc. SelectHealth, Inc.. (Keegan, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/18 1:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SelectHealth, Inc. identifying Intermountain Health as Corporate Parent. (Keegan, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/18 1:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant SelectHealth, Inc.. (Keegan, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/18 1:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVSB2504049 Receipt No: ACACDC-39536599 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Select Health, Inc. SelectHealth, Inc.. (Attorney Timothy Mark Keegan added to party SelectHealth, Inc.(pty:dft))(Keegan, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CV-71,
Att: 2 Declaration of Timothy M. Keegan,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, Complaint, Service Package,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - SelectHealth, Inc.'s Answer to State Court Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Aston Carter, Inc.'s Answer to State Court Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Declaration of Horacio Ramirez (Aston Carter, Inc.),
Att: 7 Declaration of Bryan Nielsen (SelectHealth, Inc.),
Att: 8 Declaration of Danny Pham
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 04/22 12:54 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aston Carter, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Danny Pham, SelectHealth, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Sol Mia Taylor. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/19/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 04/22 12:56 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant SelectHealth, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 04/22 12:58 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Aston Carter, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap)
Related: [-]