California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:25-cv-00814
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02025-01465352-CU-
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 2:09 PM PDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By
Sabrina Celia Narain
Ltl Attorneys LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ramiro Roman


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 04/22 3:00 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Scheduling Conference is set for 6/26/2025 at 9:00 a.m. **Counsel shall review full Order for details.** (rrp)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/22 2:59 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (rrp)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/22 12:46 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/22 12:46 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/22 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/18 1:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/18 1:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/18 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2025 01465352-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-39536804 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attorney Sabrina Celia Narain added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Narain, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sabrina Narain in support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 04/22 1:13 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Ramiro Roman. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/7/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 04/22 1:15 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap)
Related: [-]