Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence G Berg
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:25-cv-11132
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Case in other court:Macomb County Circuit Court, 25-001158-CK
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 5:11 PM EDT
Defendant
Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By
Richard W. Warren
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Gordon


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
2 2 order Stipulation and Order Thu 04/24 12:22 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Response to1 Complaint. Answer or Response due by 6/24/2025. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 04/21 9:27 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JBro)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Fri 04/18 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada from Macomb County, case number 2025-001158-CK. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10204435 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Warren, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal