New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:25-cv-02179
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 5:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency
Defendant
John Doe #1 through John Doe #12
Defendant
Babette Miller
Plaintiff
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By
Anthony Cellucci
Robertson, Anschutz, Schneid, Crane & Partners, PLLC
contact info
Sara Zahava Boriskin
Robertson, Anschutz, Schneid, Crane & Partners, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/15 5:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency. (Schirmer, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/05 4:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency served on 4/30/2025, answer due 5/21/2025. (Boriskin, Sara)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 05/05 4:23 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Scheduling Order with Proof of Service by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Bruderman, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of mailing
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/05 1:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for July 1, 2025 at 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/5/2025. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 10:51 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Corporate Parent GSAA Home Equity Trust for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Bruderman, Christina)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Rose Bruderman on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (aty to be noticed) (Bruderman, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
order Order(Other) Tue 04/22 3:54 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file the required Rule 7 disclosure statement, as subject matter jurisdiction in this matter is predicated on diversity of citizenship. Failure to file the required disclosure statement by May 6, 2025, may lead to dismissal, or other appropriate remedies. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/22/2025. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 10:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency, Babette Miller. (SMF)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 04/21 10:26 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SMF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/21 10:24 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (SMF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/21 10:25 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/18 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Zahava Boriskin on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (aty to be noticed) (Boriskin, Sara)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/18 4:30 PM
Proposed Summons. by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Cellucci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/18 4:30 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Cellucci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency, John Doe #1 through John Doe #12, Babette Miller filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18968028, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Cellucci, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C,
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D,
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E,
Att: 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F,
Att: 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G