New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 1:25-cv-00482
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/21 9:05 AM
TEXT ORDER: Having considered the application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. § 1915, Plaintiff's3 in forma pauperis application is GRANTED. Pursuant to General Order No. 18 of this District, Defendant shall file a certified transcript of the administrative proceedings, which shall constitute Defendant's answer, within 90 days of said filing of a notice of attorney appearance, or a motion to dismiss the Complaint within 90 days of said filing. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/21/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner Mon 04/21 7:28 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Shannon Fishel appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 7/21/2025. (Fishel, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 misc G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form Fri 04/18 3:28 PM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . (hmr)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent / Declination Form Fri 04/18 3:27 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Emily Jean Smith advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (hmr)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/18 3:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Emily Jean Smith Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (hmr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED] Fri 04/18 3:24 PM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (hmr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmpssa Complaint - Social Security Appeal Fri 04/18 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(hmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet