South Carolina District Court
Judge:Cameron Mcgowan Currie
Referred: Shiva V Hodges
Case #: 3:25-cv-03311
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/25 2:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/15/2025, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/29/2025, Rule 26 Report due by 5/29/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/24/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/25/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/22/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/22/2025, Discovery due by 11/21/2025, Motions due by 12/8/2025, ADR Statement due by 1/5/2026, Mediation Due by 2/4/2026. If the parties enter mediation, they are directed to complete the attached form and return it to the Court by no later than 11/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 4/25/2025. (cpri)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 04/25 1:51 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ty Carlton McComas.(Morrison, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/25 1:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Ty Carlton McComas.(Morrison, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 04/22 1:28 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Viola McDaniel.(Kenney, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 service Certificate of Service Fri 04/18 3:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ty Carlton McComas re1 Notice of Removal 3 Civil Cover Sheet, and4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories. (cpri)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 04/18 3:17 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ty Carlton McComas. (cpri)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc True Division for Trial Fri 04/18 3:16 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (cpri)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/18 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Ty Carlton McComas from Lexington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2025-CP 32-01230 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12400796). (cpri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents