Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referred: Stephen B Jackson, Jr
Case #: 4:25-cv-00144
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Disc Relay Worldwide, Inc.
3726 Las Vegas Blvd. S Unit 1908
Las Vegas, NV 89158
Defendant
Disc Replay Worldwide, Inc.
11930 Otto Lane
Carmel, IN 46032
Defendant
Replay Holdings, LLC
23782 Seminole Trail
Novi, MI 48375
Plaintiff
Tapp, LLC
Represented By
Rebecca E. Coleman
Brown Winick
contact info
Brant D. Kahler
Brown Winick
contact info


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/01 4:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tapp, LLC; (Coleman, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/01 4:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tapp, LLC; Disc Replay Worldwide, Inc. waiver served on 4/30/2025, answer due 6/30/2025. (Coleman, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/01 4:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tapp, LLC; Replay Holdings, LLC waiver served on 4/30/2025, answer due 6/30/2025. (Coleman, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF Mon 04/28 2:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Tapp, LLC. (Coleman, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Elizabeth Meggison Decker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Meggison Decker, Jordan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Mon 04/21 9:05 AM
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 5/12/2025. (btg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7.1 Packet
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Disc Relay Worldwide, Inc., Disc Replay Worldwide, Inc., Replay Holdings, LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5725198., filed by Tapp, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/17/2025. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/17/2025.(Kahler, Brant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet