Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Referred: Jared C Bennett
Case #: 2:25-cv-00307
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 5:09 PM MDT
Defendant
Spencer Cox
350 N. State Street Suite 200 P.O. Box 142220
Salt Lake City, UT 84114
Defendant
Matthew B. Durrant
Defendant
Ronald B. Gordon
Matheson Courthouse 450 South State St P.O. Box 140241
Salt Lake City, UT 84114
Defendant
State of Utah
350 N. State Street Suite 200 P.O. Box 142220
Salt Lake City, UT 84114
Defendant
Utah Administrative Office of the Courts
Matheson Courthouse 450 South State St P.O. Box 140241
Salt Lake City, UT 84114
Defendant
Utah Judicial Council
450 South State Street 5th Floor PO Box 140210
Salt Lake City, UT 84114
Plaintiff
Disability Law Center
960 South Main Street
Salt Lake City, UT 84101
Represented By
Jason Michael Groth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/09 10:31 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER : On 5/8/2025, Plaintiff Disability Law Center filed an unopposed Motion for an Amended Scheduling Order (dkt. 29 ). The court GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiff may file a Reply in Support of its 2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and For a Preliminary Injunction no later than June 20, 2025. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 5/9/2025. No attached document. (mh)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Modification of Docket Fri 05/09 10:29 AM
Modification of Docket re29 : Error: Pleading filed under motion event, Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Pleading request time to file reply to2 Motion for TRO. Correction: Pleading motion event corrected to, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. No further action needed. (mh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
29 29 motion Amended Scheduling Order Thu 05/08 6:51 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Disability Law Center. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
28 28 motion Dismiss Party Thu 05/08 12:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Party Chief Justice Matthew B. Durrant, Ronald B. Gordon, Jr., the Utah Judicial Council, and the Utah Administrative Office of the Courts and Memorandum in Support MOTION filed by Defendants Matthew B. Durrant, Ronald B. Gordon, Jr, Utah Administrative Office of the Courts, Utah Judicial Council. Attorney Bryson King added to party Matthew B. Durrant(pty:dft), Attorney Bryson King added to party Ronald B. Gordon, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Bryson King added to party Utah Administrative Office of the Courts(pty:dft), Attorney Bryson King added to party Utah Judicial Council(pty:dft)(King, Bryson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 3:00 PM
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Aditi Fruitwala for Disability Law Center. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/30/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Wed 04/30 1:06 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aditi Fruitwala , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5411931, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Disability Law Center.(Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
25 25 3 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 04/24 3:09 PM
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Granting Stipulated Motion to Stay. An in person hearing set on Motion 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2025 at 01:30 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 4/24/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Status Conference Thu 04/24 2:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Status Conference held on 4/24/2025. Counsel appeared before the court. A discussion is held with counsel. The court GRANTS the parties stipulated oral motion to stay enactment and enforcement of Utah Senate Bill 199 until the court rules on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Until such ruling, the parties agree to maintain the status quo with respect to respondents in guardianship proceedings as if S.B. 199 had not been passed. Defendants Chief Justice Matthew B. Durrant, Ronald B. Gordon, Jr., and the Utah Administrative Office of the Courts (the Judiciary Defendants) are ORDERED to file any applicable Rule 12 motions on or before May 8, 2025. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Response to any Rule 12 motion on or before May 22, 2025. The Judiciary Defendants may file a Reply in support of any Rule 12 motion on or before May 30, 2025. Defendants Spencer Cox and the State of Utah (the State Defendants) are ORDERED to file a Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on or before May 30, 2025. Plaintiff may file a Reply on or before June 6, 2025. An in person hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction will be held on July 17, 2025, at 1:30 PM in Room 3.100. The court orders that by July 3, 2025, the parties are to meet and confer to discuss which witnesses (if any) will be taking testimony and to notify the court accordingly. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer within 14 days of this courts ruling on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to propose a scheduling order. The State Defendants are ORDERED to file an answer or any applicable Rule 12 motions no later than 30 days after this courts ruling on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jason Growth, Nathaniel Crippes, Laura Henric; Attorney for Defendant: David Wolf, Bryson King. Court Reporter: Ed Young. Recording: Electronic. (Time Start: 10:05, Time End: 11:00, Room 3.100.)(mjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 04/23 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re21 Refund Request-Duplicate or Erroneous Payment in a Case. The document Refund Request has been stricken. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile in case 2:24-nr-9999 the request regarding the duplicate payment for registration. (nl)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/23 3:39 PM
NOTICE of CONFIRMING SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS by Disability Law Center (Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return of Service
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
21 21 misc Refund Request-Duplicate or Erroneous Payment in a Case Tue 04/22 3:32 PM
REFUND REQUEST FOR INCORRECT PAYMENT AMOUNT filed by Ford, Thomas. Authorized refunds for credit card or debit card payments will be processed through Pay.gov. Authorized refunds of ACH payments will be issued by check through the U.S. Treasury. A waiting period of up to 30 days may be required before your request is approved. If you have not received your refund after 40 days, please contact the clerk's office and ask to speak someone in the finance department. (Ford, Thomas )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/21 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Status Conference set for 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing or Trial Mon 04/21 3:55 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Status and Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 4/21/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 3:46 PM
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Zoe Brennan-Krohn for Disability Law Center. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/21/25. (mh)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 3:43 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michelle Fraling for Disability Law Center. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/21/25. (mh)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 3:40 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian Dimmick for Disability Law Center. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/21/25. (mh)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Ineligible Attorney Mon 04/21 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Tom Ford, for Plaintiff Disability Law Center, has been notified that he/she is not in active status or has not been admitted to practice in this court and can not practice before this court. (sg)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/21 1:40 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 4/21/2025. (mjm)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Mon 04/21 11:24 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zoe Brennan-Krohn , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5400870, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Disability Law Center.(Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
12 12 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Mon 04/21 11:22 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michelle Fraling , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5400859, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Disability Law Center.(Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
11 11 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Mon 04/21 11:19 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Dimmick , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5400842, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Disability Law Center.(Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application
10 10 misc Modification of Docket Mon 04/21 9:57 AM
Modification of Docket re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Error: The document requests two reliefs, therefore both events should have been chosen at the time of filing. Correction: MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order added to the filing. No further action is needed, please note for future reference. (alf)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 04/21 9:49 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Spencer Cox. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 04/21 9:49 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Matthew B. Durrant. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 04/21 9:48 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Ronald B. Gordon, Jr. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice PHV Requirements Mon 04/21 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice emailed to attorney Zoe Brennan Krohn, Brian Dimmick, Michelle Fraling for Disability Law Center. (sg)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/21 8:55 AM
Judge Robert J. Shelby added. Case number will now read 2:25-cv-00307-RJS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 service Request Summons Fri 04/18 4:51 PM
Requested Summons as to Ronald B. Gordon. (Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request Summons Fri 04/18 4:50 PM
Requested Summons as to Spencer Cox. (Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request Summons Fri 04/18 4:49 PM
Requested Summons as to Matthew B. Durrant. (Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 04/18 4:47 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Disability Law Center.(Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 04/18 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT (Motion for Temporary Restraining Order to be filed separately) against Spencer Cox, Matthew B. Durrant, Ronald B. Gordon, State of Utah, Utah Judicial Council, Utah Administrative Office of the Courts with filing fee previously paid filed by Disability Law Center. (Groth, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet