California Southern District Court
Judge:Gonzalo P Curiel
Referred: Barbara Lynn Major
Case #: 3:25-cv-00934
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441wt Removal- Employment (Wrongful Termination)
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, San Diego, 25CU010199C
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 5:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Does 1-50
Defendant
Remington Hotels LLC
Represented By
Alia Louisa Chaib
Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Julio Mendez
Represented By
Christopher K. Monelt
Law Firm Of Christopher K. Monelt
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 8 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Mon 04/21 11:45 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/19/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/21/25.(jmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/18 4:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Remington Hotels LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (axc1)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 04/18 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Remington Hotels LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Remington Holdings GP, LLC, Other Affiliate Ashford Hospitality Services LLC, Other Affiliate Remington Holdings, L.P., Other Affiliate Remington Hospitality Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Ashford Advisors, Inc. for Remington Hotels LLC. (axc1)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 04/18 3:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Remington Hotels LLC. (axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/18 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19813638.), filed by Remington Hotels LLC. The new case number is 3:25-cv-934-GPC-BLM. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Alia L. Chaib in Support of Removal to Federal Court,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Robyn Trosper in Support of Removal to Federal Court,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Chaib Declaration - Superior Court Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Chaib Declaration - Superior Court Answer to Complaint