California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:25-cv-03476
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:2510 Wire Interception
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 5:07 PM PDT
Defendant
ROBLOX CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, doing business as Roblox
Plaintiff
R. G.
Represented By
Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Davis And Norris
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Garcia
764 Earling Way
El Cajon, CA 92021
Represented By
Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Davis And Norris
contact info
Plaintiff
Salena Garcia
764 Earling Way
El Cajon, CA 92021
Represented By
Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Davis And Norris
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 05/14 1:40 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Mon 05/05 4:36 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-03476-WLH (AJRx). (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/22 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/22 1:30 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Roblox Corporation. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/22 1:27 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/22 1:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/22 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 notice Summons Request Fri 04/18 5:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs R. G., Michael Garcia, Salena Garcia. (Salgado, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 45 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/18 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39540361 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Garcia, Salena Garcia, R. G.. (Attorney Robert Benjamin Salgado, III added to party Michael Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Benjamin Salgado, III added to party Salena Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Benjamin Salgado, III added to party R. G.(pty:pla))(Salgado, Robert)
Related: [-]