Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:25-cv-00975
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 1:18 AM EDT
Defendant
AvantLights LLC
Defendant
Saamir A. Mithwani
Plaintiff
Cured Nutrition LLC
Represented By
Issac S. Crum
Messner Reeves LLP
contact info
Hettie Haines
Messner Reeves LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 04/29 11:42 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Hettie Haines and Issac S. Crum Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JVC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 04/25 9:07 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Hettie Haines and Issac S. Crum of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JVC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/24 2:26 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 04/24 2:25 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
misc Fees Paid - Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 1:04 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID Related [+] by attorney Hettie Haines. Related document:7 MOTION for Hettie Haines to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
Related: [-] ceipt Number TPA072125 for $150
misc Fees Paid - Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 1:12 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID Related [+] by attorney Isaac S. Crum. Related document:3 MOTION for Issac S. Crum to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
Related: [-] ceipt Number TPA072126 for $150
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/21 10:26 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 7 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission as to attorney Hettie Haines based on the Court's April 18, 2025, Order granting attorney Haines's prior motion for special admission. See (4); see also ( 2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 4/21/2025. (MEL)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Patent/Trademark Report Mon 04/21 8:33 AM
Trademark Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 4:33 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Hettie Haines to appear pro hac vice by Cured Nutrition LLC. (e-portal) (JKB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 04/18 11:35 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Issac S. Crum and Hettie Haine Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 8:41 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's 3 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission as to attorney Isaac S. Crum. If counsel has not already done so, within fourteen (14) days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration (more information available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 4/18/2025. (MEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 8:37 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's 2 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission as to attorney Hettie Haines. If counsel has not already done so, within fourteen (14) days hereof, she shall complete the e-filer registration (more information available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 4/18/2025. (MEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 1:27 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Isaac S. Crum to appear pro hac vice by Cured Nutrition LLC. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 1:25 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Hettie Haines to appear pro hac vice by Cured Nutrition LLC. (e-portal) (JKB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/17/2025) (JKB)
Related: [-]
1 1 62 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 1:23 PM
COMPLAINT against AvantLights LLC, Saamir A. Mithwani with Jury Demand filed by Cured Nutrition LLC. Fees not paid, IFP not filed. (e-portal) (JKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons