Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-03037
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Case in other court:New Jersey, 3:25-cv-02134
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 4:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Solvay Specialty Polymers USA LLC
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation LLC
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
E I DuPont De Nemours Company Inc
Defendant
EIDP Inc
Defendant
Honeywell International Inc
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
The 3M Company
Represented By
Michael Charles Zogby
Barnes And Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas LLC
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Plaintiff
Ralph Mccall
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eulalee Richards
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stacy Rease
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joaquin Quinones
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Monserrate Perez
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stacy Richards
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa Oliver
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lesley Nyborg
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Bruno Niemczyk
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Newcomb
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Randi Wright
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabor Nap
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Latoya Murphy
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jr Mccarthy
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Julia Roberts
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alnisa Robinson
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Benny Robles
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Sargeant
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chantelle Simmons
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Denise Smith
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancy Smith
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Smith
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryant Watson
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marilyn Walker
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Walker
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ioneides Sousa
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charlene Spann
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Spivey
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Tiseo
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlisle St. Martin
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alex Cardoso
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Giordano
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bernice Giles
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George Fraggos
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Fox
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eva Donaldson
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Faith Dawson
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Loxley P. Creasy
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Cotton
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Ciofalo
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Roger Gragg
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Bullock, Jr.
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Brunson
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bobby G. Brown
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey A. Bracco
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Frederick Boykin
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Natasha Barnard
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Badour
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Diane Ambus
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffany Hughes
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Erica Lofton
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Deidra Lawrence
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Leon Lassiter
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas Kurschinski
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Kirkland
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Kilroy
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Kaye
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Curtis Jensen
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hunter
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chet Malanowski
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Monica Howard-Smith
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darrell Hines
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Lee Haugen
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancy Harrington
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander Harber
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joel Hall
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Latanya R. Grimes
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenny Graham
Represented By
Robert Gitelman
Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
7 7 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 04/18 12:09 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey (associated as of 4/17/25), 3:25-cv-02134, Kirkland et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-03037-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 04/18 11:39 AM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:25-cv-02134. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-247) transferring case to the District of South Carolina. (jjc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Case extracted via ECF to the District of South Carolina. (jjc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 4/8/2025. (mlh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending JPML Decision on Transfer by THE 3M COMPANY. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines as to3 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending JPML Decision on Transfer . Motion set for 5/5/2025 before Judge Georgette Castner. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr3) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on 3/28/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Please email a flattened version to ecfhelp@njd.uscourts.gov for replacement on the docket. (dmr3, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr3) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE 3M COMPANY. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE 3M COMPANY from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID L 001151 25. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16127372), filed by THE 3M COMPANY.(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/31/2025) (amv). [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings
Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn added. (dmr3) [Transferred from New Jersey on 4/18/2025.]
Related: [-]