South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-03214
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 1:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Georgetown Memorial Hospital
Defendant
Waccamaw Community Hospital
Plaintiff
TDC Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Morgan S Templeton
Wall Templeton And Haldrup
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 3:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE by TDC Specialty Insurance Company. Georgetown Memorial Hospital waiver executed on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025.(Templeton, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Service-Georgetown Memorial
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/25 3:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE by TDC Specialty Insurance Company. Waccamaw Community Hospital waiver executed on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025.(Templeton, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Service-Waccamaw Community Hospital
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/17 11:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Georgetown Memorial Hospital, Waccamaw Community Hospital. (cper, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 04/17 11:47 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by TDC Specialty Insurance Company.(cper, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT against Georgetown Memorial Hospital, Waccamaw Community Hospital ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12392742.), filed by TDC Specialty Insurance Company. Service due by 7/15/2025(cper, ) (cper, ). Modified on 4/17/2025 to add attachments as provided by filing user (cper, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/17/2025) Exhibit A - 2020-2021 Policy,
Att: 2 (4/17/2025) Exhibit B - 2022-2023 Policy,
Att: 3 (4/17/2025) Exhibit C - 2024-2025 Policy