Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:25-bk-41091
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 22, 2025

Debtor
Paroo Properties, LLC
5045 Bridge Creek Dr
Plano, TX 75093-5705
Represented By
Christopher J. Moser
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Linda S Payne
Linda S. Payne, Trustee 11700 Preston Road Suite 660-667
Dallas, TX 75230
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 04/19/2025 1:03 AM CDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
misc Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Fri 04/18 11:24 AM
Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by Paroo Properties, LLC Document Due 04/25/2025. (Moser, Christopher)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 04/18 11:26 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-41091 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13879617, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 04/18 11:22 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Without Schedules, Statements, and All Other Required Documents. Filed by Paroo Properties, LLC, Document Due 04/25/2025. Atty Disclosure Statement due 5/2/2025. Schedule A due 5/2/2025. Schedule B due 5/2/2025. Schedule D due 5/2/2025. Schedule E due 5/2/2025. Schedule F due 5/2/2025. Schedule G due 5/2/2025. Schedule H due 5/2/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/2/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/2/2025.(Moser, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Fri 04/18 11:46 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Payne, Linda S with 341(a)
Related: [-]