Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:G Michael Halfenger
Case #: 2:25-bk-22125
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025

Debtor
Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC
PO Box 375
Genesee Depot, WI 53127-0375
Represented By
Michael Jurkash
Swanson Sweet LLP
contact info
Craig E. Stevenson
Swanson Sweet LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
517 East Wisconsin Ave. Room 430
Milwaukee, WI 53202


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/02 11:34 AM
Order Scheduling Evidentiary Hearing on Debtor's Motion to Provide Adequate Protection and Use Cash Collateral Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 5/8/2025 at 10:00 AM at United States Courthouse at 517 East Wisconsin Avenue, Room 133, Milwaukee, Wisconsin. (amg, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 05/02/2025)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for adequate protection and / or use of conditional Cash Collateral /Motion for Entry of Order (A) Authorizing Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC's Use of Cash Collateral and (B) Granting Adequate Protection
Thursday, May 01, 2025
14 14 answer Objection Thu 05/01 3:41 PM
Limited Objection Filed by Creditor Waukesha State Bank to Debtor's Motion for Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection Related [+] and Certificate of Service (Brockmeyer, Beth)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for adequate protection and / or use of conditional Cash Collateral /Motion for Entry of Order (A) Authorizing Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC's Use of Cash Collateral and (B) Granting Adequate Protection filed by Debtor In Possession Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/21 3:22 PM
Certificate of Service /Declaration of Service filed by Michael Jurkash on behalf of Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC. Related [+]. (Jurkash, Michael)
Related: [-] 6 Declaration
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/21 3:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Certificate of Service filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U. S. Trustee (Ambrose, Dillon)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/21 3:01 PM
Certificate of Service /Declaration of Service for Motion for Entry of Order (A) Authorizing Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC's Use of Cash Collateral and (B) Granting Adequate Protection filed by Michael Jurkash on behalf of Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC. Related [+]. (Jurkash, Michael)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for adequate protection and / or use of conditional Cash Collateral /Motion for Entry of Order (A) Authorizing Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC's Use of Cash Collateral and (B) Granting Adequate Protection
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/21 2:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Beth M. Brockmeyer on behalf of Waukesha State Bank. (Brockmeyer, Beth)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/21 2:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Daniel J. Habeck on behalf of Waukesha State Bank. (Habeck, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
8 8 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 04/21 10:02 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Craig E. Stevenson on behalf of Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC. (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Update Deficiency Deadlines Mon 04/21 9:59 AM
Deficiency Deadlines Updated Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H (with declaration under penalty of perjury) due 5/2/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/2/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/2/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/2/2025. (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Declaration Fri 04/18 5:28 PM
Declaration of Kristina Verzi filed by Craig E. Stevenson on behalf of Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC. (Stevenson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC Budget
5 5 7 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral Fri 04/18 5:27 PM
Motion for adequate protection and / or use of conditional Cash Collateral /Motion for Entry of Order (A) Authorizing Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC's Use of Cash Collateral and (B) Granting Adequate Protection with Notice of Motion filed by Craig E. Stevenson of Swanson Sweet LLP on behalf of Debtor Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC. Objections due by 5/2/2025. (Stevenson, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Order (A) Authorizing Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC's Use of Cash Collateral and (B) Granting Adequate Protection
Att: 2 Notice of Motion for Entry of Order (A) Authorizing Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC's Use of Cash Collateral and (B) Granting Adequate Protection
4 4 6 pgs motion Employ Fri 04/18 5:15 PM
Application to Employ Swanson Sweet LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel /Notice and Application for Authority to Retain and Employ Swanson Sweet LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel and Certificate of Service filed by Michael Jurkash of Swanson Sweet LLP on behalf of Debtor Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC. (Jurkash, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Craig E. Stevenson
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Order Granting Application for Authority to Retain and Employ Swanson Sweet LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel
Att: 3 Declaration of Service for Notice and Application for Authority to Retain and Employ Swanson Sweet LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 04/18 4:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-22125 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23495197. Fee amount 1738.00 Related [+] . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court Case Assigned Fri 04/18 3:54 PM
Judge G. Michael Halfenger added to case. (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11) Fri 04/18 3:35 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Pacific Prairie Holdings, LLC Fee Amount: $1738. (Stevenson, Craig)
Related: [-]