Minnesota District Court
Case #: 0:25-mj-00143
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 2:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Michael Bruce Gillis (1)
Represented By
Hillary B. Parsons
Tamburino Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jordan L Sing
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/19/2025 2:34 AM CDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT by USA Jordan Sing with affidavit of FBI TFO Kevin Brown as to Michael Bruce Gillis (1) by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins (MME)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 Bench Warrant Issued as to Michael Bruce Gillis by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins. (MME)
Related: [-]
3 3 APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM as to Michael Bruce Gillis. Writ issued and delivered to the USM on 3/20/2025. cc: USA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 3/20/2025. (MME)
Related: [-]
4 4 MJ Duty Case Opening Form. (MME)
Related: [-]