Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00717
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 2:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (1)
Represented By
Blas Hernandez Delgado, Jr.
Law Offices Of Blas H. Delgado, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph Duarte, II
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/19/2025 2:51 AM CDT
Saturday, February 15, 2025
Arrest of Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (drda) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza. (drda) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza. (drda) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza. (drda) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza. (drda) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza held on 2/19/2025 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 2/24/2025 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Blas Hernandez Delgado, Jr for Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza appointed. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Continue by Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza. (Delgado, Blas) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Continue as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (1) Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 3/3/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 MOTION to Continue by Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza. (Delgado, Blas) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Continue as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (1) Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 3/4/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova,. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (mgc) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza. (ic) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Bond by Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza. (ic) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
9 9 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza held on 3/4/2025 (Court Reporter FTR-Gold-MG Cienega.) (ic) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL; ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to NO BOND as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (1); DENYING ORAL Motion for Bond as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (1). Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:25-mj-00479-JAC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
11 11 INFORMATION as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (1) count(s) 1. (ccr)
Related: [-]
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Karen Melissa Rivera-Mendoza (ccr)
Related: [-]