Washington Western District Court
Judge:David G Estudillo
Case #: 2:25-cv-00708
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 1:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Todd Lyons
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Plaintiff
Student Doe #4
Represented By
Victoria Dobrin
Dobrin & Han PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 order Consolidation Order - for Member cases only Mon 04/28 12:23 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES re13 Notice. The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. Student Doe #2 et al v. Noem , Case No. 2:25-cv-00680-DGE and Student Doe #4 , Case No. 2:25-cv-00708-DGE SHALL be consolidated with Student Doe 1 , Case No. 2:25-cv-00663-DGE. 2. Going forward, all filings for any of the above matters shall all be filed in Student Doe 1 , Case No. 2:25-cv-00663-DGE. 3. The briefing schedule set forth above is adopted and any prior case schedule contained in the previously separated cases are VACATED. 4. The Clerk of the Court is directed to change the above-captioned action to include the consolidated cases. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(CJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 notice Notice-Other Fri 04/25 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF STIPUALTED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES ; filed by All Defendants. (Passmore, Whitney)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes TRO Hearing Fri 04/25 1:54 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo- Dep Clerk: Gretchen Craft ; Pla Counsel: Hilary Han ; Def Counsel: Whitney Passmore ; CR: Sheri Schelbert ; Time of Hearing: 10:30 ; Courtroom: B ; TRO Hearing held on 4/25/2025. For the reasons stated on the record, the parties agree that a hearing on the TRO today is moot. The Court GRANTS the motion for TRO; order will issue. (MGC)
Related: [-]
11 11 25 pgs order Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 04/25 12:47 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants are ENJOINED for a period of fourteen days from the date of this order, as follows: 1) Defendants shall restore Plaintiff's F-1 student record and I-20 in the Student and Exchange Visitor Information System (SEVIS); 2) Defendants shall set aside the April 8, 2025 F-1 student record and I-20 termination as to Plaintiff; 3) Defendants shall not terminate Plaintiff's student record and I-20 in SEVIS absent a valid ground as set forth in 8 C.F.R. §§ 214.1(d)(g); 214.2(f). 4) Defendants are prohibited from detaining or transferring Plaintiff out of this Court's jurisdiction, or ordering the detention or transfer of Plaintiff out of this Court's jurisdiction, as a result of the termination of her F-1 student record or I-20 in SEVIS on April 8, 2025; and 5) Defendants are prohibited from initiating removal proceedings against or deporting Plaintiff on the basis of the April 8, 2025 termination of her F-1 student record or I-20 in SEVIS. It is furthered ORDERED that the security requirement of Rule 65(c) is waived. The Court ORDERS the Parties to appear for a Preliminary Injunction hearing at 1:30 p.m. PT on May 7, 2025. (Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/7/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom B before U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.) Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(CJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 trial Exhibit Thu 04/24 5:38 PM
EXHIBIT re8 Response to Motion,3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs(Dobrin, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh 3
9 9 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/24 10:58 AM
REPLY, filed by All Plaintiffs, TO RESPONSE to3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Dobrin, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/23 4:40 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem, to3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Passmore, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
7 7 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/22 11:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. No.3 ). Defendants SHALL file a responsive brief no later than Wednesday, April 23, 2025, at 5:00 p.m. PT. Plaintiffs SHALL file a reply brief by Thursday, April 24, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. PT. The Parties SHALL appear for a TRO hearing on Friday, April 25, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. in the Tacoma Courthouse, Courtroom B. Authorized by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (MW)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice-Other Tue 04/22 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem. (Passmore, Whitney)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Whitney Passmore on behalf of Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem. (Passmore, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 order 2 - Minute Order Mon 04/21 3:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On April 21, 2025, Plaintiff filed a motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (TRO). (Dkt. No.3 ). The motion was noted for April 25, 2025, but notice has not yet been served on Defendants. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(1) provides that a court may issue a TRO without written or oral notice to the adverse party or its attorney only if specific facts in an affidavit or a verified complaint clearly show that immediate and irreparable injury, loss, or damage will result to the movant before the adverse party can be heard in opposition and the movant's attorney certifies in writing any efforts made to give notice and the reasons why it should not be required. Since Plaintiff has not met these requirements, the Court cannot consider an ex parte motion. Accordingly, if Plaintiff does seek a no-notice TRO, Plaintiff is ORDERED to comply with Rule 65(b)(1) and submit an affidavit enumerating the reasons why notice should not be required. Alternatively, if Plaintiff did not intend to move for a no-notice TRO, the Court will set a briefing schedule once Plaintiff files confirmation that Defendants have been properly served. Authorized by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (MDH)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/21 10:02 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by All Plaintiffs. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 4/25/2025, (Dobrin, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Student Doe 4,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 8:23 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendants Kristi Noem and Todd Lyons.(AVC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/21 8:06 AM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned to Judge Mon 04/21 10:01 AM
Case Reassigned to U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson no longer assigned to the case. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/18 7:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Related [+] Attorney Victoria Dobrin added to party Student Doe #4(pty:pla) filed by Student Doe #4.(Dobrin, Victoria)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8937427
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons