Original Case: 1:24-cv-01576

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05125
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Martin Makary, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Food and Drugs
Represented By
Scott P. Kennedy
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Brian James Springer
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Melissa Nicole Patterson
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
United States Food and Drug Administration
Represented By
Scott P. Kennedy
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Brian James Springer
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Melissa Nicole Patterson
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., in his official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By
Scott P. Kennedy
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Brian James Springer
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Melissa Nicole Patterson
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By
Scott P. Kennedy
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Brian James Springer
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Melissa Nicole Patterson
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Intervenor for Defendant - Appellee
Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By
Michael David Shumsky
Hyman, Phelps & McNamara, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Neurelis Inc.
Represented By
Eva Temkin
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/19/2025 4:17 AM EDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5125
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2111522] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:24-cv-01576-APM filed by Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., Martin Makary, HHS and FDA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5125 25-5125
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2111534] filed consolidating cases 25-5125 (Consolidation started 04/17/2025) with 25-5031 25-5031 25-5125
Related: [-]