California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-70456
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 12:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Jonathan Ureta-Lopez (1)
Represented By
Jessica Yu
Federal Public Defender, Northern District Of California
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christoffer Lee
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 1:20 AM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Set Hearing as to Defendant Jonathan Ureta-Lopez : Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 4/17/2025 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Spanish Interpreter Needed in case as to Jonathan Ureta-Lopez. (amk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 Notice of Proceedings on Out-of-District Criminal Charges Pursuant to Rules 5(c)(2) and (3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure as to Jonathan Ureta-Lopez (1). (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Initial Appearance as to Jonathan Ureta-Lopez held on 4/17/2025. CJA23 Submitted as to Jonathan Ureta-Lopez. The government stated proffer re the motion for detention on the record. The Defendant requests to defer the waiver as to Rule 5 to the next hearing date. DPPA advised. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Status Re: Detention set for 4/21/2025 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Plaintiff's Attorney:Christoffer Lee. Defendant's Attorney:Jessica Yu. Pretrial Officer: Gustavo Rangel. Interpreter: Lupita Arce-Spanish. Liberty: 13 Minutes (1:06-1:19 p.m. mins). Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: Yes. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jonathan Ureta-Lopez (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]