California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01879
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 12:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Josue Raymundo Hernandez Ruiz (2)
Represented By
Danielle Renee Peay
Danielle R. Peay
contact info
Defendant
Luis Fernando Hernandez Ruiz (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Marissa Angela Martinez
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Material Witness
Angel David Constantino Vazquez
Represented By
Sarah Ann Nicole Garrick
Attorney Sarah Garrick
contact info
Material Witness
Darinel Gomez Lopez
Represented By
Sarah Ann Nicole Garrick
Attorney Sarah Garrick
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Brendan Barber
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 1:49 AM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
Arrest of Luis Fernando Hernandez Ruiz, Josue Raymundo Hernandez Ruiz (no document attached) (cxl)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Luis Fernando Hernandez Ruiz, Josue Raymundo Hernandez Ruiz.(cxl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Sarah Ann Nicole Garrick appointed for Darinel Gomez Lopez and Angel David Constantino Vazquez. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Luis Fernando Hernandez Ruiz, Josue Raymundo Hernandez Ruiz : Initial Appearance set for 4/17/2025 before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Initial Appearance as to Luis Fernando Hernandez Ruiz(1), Josue Raymundo Hernandez Ruiz(2) held on 4/17/2025. Appointed Federal Defenders for Luis Fernando Hernandez Ruiz(1) and attorney Danielle Renee Peay(n/a) appointed for Josue Raymundo Hernandez Ruiz (2). Bond set as to Luis Fernando Hernandez Ruiz (1) No Bail and Josue Raymundo Hernandez Ruiz (2) No Bail. Government oral motion to detain(Flight) as to each defendant. ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 4/22/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit.) Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 5/1/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Arraignment set for 5/15/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit.) The Court confirms the appointment of MW attorney Sara Ann Nicole Garrick(n/a). (Interpreter Daniel Novoa). (CD# 4/17/2025 MMP 25-1:4:00-4:21). (Plaintiff Attorney Connor Veneski AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Cindy Muro FD-S/A). (aje) Modified on 4/17/2025 (aje).
Related: [-]
4 4 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight) by USA as to Luis Fernando Hernandez Ruiz. (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight) by USA as to Josue Raymundo Hernandez Ruiz. (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Luis Fernando Hernandez Ruiz, Josue Raymundo Hernandez Ruiz (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]