California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-01263
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 12:32 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Hunter V. Norton
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (1)
Terminated: 04/18/2025
Represented By
Sebastian Llewellyn Swain-Gil
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info

GPO Apr 18 2025
JUDGMENT as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (1), Count(s) 1, Defendant sentenced to one year unsupervised probation. No fine. $10.00 S/A waived. Appeal rights waived.; Count(s) 2, Government oral motion to dismiss underlying count is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner (exs)

Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 1:50 AM PDT
Saturday, April 05, 2025
Arrest of Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (no document attached) (ecf) [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez.(ecf) [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez: Initial Appearance set for 4/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (gac) [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Hunter V. Norton appearing for USA. (Norton, Hunter)Attorney Hunter V. Norton added to party USA(pty:pla) (exs). [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez held on 4/7/2025. Oral proffer - Court appointed Federal Defenders for Juan Alonzo Gonzalez. No Bond set as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (1) Govt oral motion to detain (RF). Detention Hearing as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez held on 4/7/2025. USA oral motion for detention; motion granted as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/17/2025 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Leshner. Arraignment set for 5/1/2025 at 9:30AM before Magistrate Judge Leshner. Rule 5f advisal provided; order to follow. (Interpreter Ariela Edelson Torenberg). (CD# 4/7/2025 DDL 224; 244-248). (Plaintiff Attorney Tyler Bramlet, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney Arshi Baig, FD s/a). (dls) [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
7 7 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (no document attached) (dls) [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 4/7/2025. (ave) [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 4/7/25. (aje) [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sebastian Llewellyn Swain-Gil appearing for Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (Swain-Gil, Sebastian)Attorney Sebastian Llewellyn Swain-Gil added to party Juan Alonzo Gonzalez(pty:dft) (yxc). [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (Swain-Gil, Sebastian) (yxc). [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Juan Alonzo Gonzalez. At the request of defense counsel, Arraignment on Information / Change of Plea Hearing / Sentence without PSR set for 4/17/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (mme) [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Norton, Hunter) (axi). [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Lodgment of Plea Agreement by USA (Norton, Hunter) (exs). [3:25-mj-01617-DDL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 INFORMATION as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1, 2. (ecf)
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Arraignment on Information as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (1) Count 1,2 held on 4/17/2025. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Change of Plea Hearing as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez held on 4/17/2025. Plea entered by Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (1) Guilty Count 1. PSR Waived. All pending motions withdrawn; Pending hearing dates vacated. Plea agreement filed. Sentence Without PSR Hearing held on 4/17/2025 for Juan Alonzo Gonzalez (1), Count(s) 1, Defendant sentenced to one year unsupervised probation. No fine. $10.00 S/A waived. Appeal rights waived. Count(s) 2, Government oral motion to dismiss underlying count is granted. Abstract issued. Judge update in case as to Juan Alonzo Gonzalez. Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner added to the case. District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 25cr1263-DDL. (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos, Rodolfo Martinez). (CD# 4/17/2025 DDL 1:31-2:50). (Plaintiff Attorney Evangeline Dech, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Sebastian Swain-Gil, FD). (mme)
Related: [-]
15 15 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Juan Alonzo Gonzalez. (exs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM Read Receipt