Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00052
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Domingo Altahua-Calihua (1)
Represented By
Kathryn Ann Walton
Kathryn A. Walton PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brittany Baker, AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edky
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 4:24 AM EDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua (1). (KMP) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
3 3 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua. (Baker, Brittany) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 13, 2025
*** MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS OF Judge Matthew A. Stinnett to review re3 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA filed as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua (KMP) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
Conflict Check run. (KMP) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
5 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF UNITED STATES FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua: 1. The Motion of the US for a WHCAP3 is GRANTED; 2. The jailer shall DELIVER the Defendant to the USM for EDKY; 3. The Marshal shall DELIVER def in custody for INITIAL APPEARANCE set for 3/17/2025 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett and from time to time thereafter until this case is disposed of; and 4. The Marshal shall safely KEEP def in custody until he is no longer needed, at which time the Marshal shall RETURN def to the custody of the jailer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 2/20/2025. (KMP) cc: COR,USM,USP,D and certified copies to USM via email. (KMP). [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/21/2025) Receipt
Friday, March 07, 2025
CJA Case Assignment by Clerk: APPOINTED CJA Attorney Kathryn Ann Walton for Domingo Altahua-Calihua. cc: COR, USP, USM (KM) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
ORAL MOTION by USA for pretrial detention (KMP) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
CJA Appointment of Attorney for Domingo Altahua-Calihua. The Clerk ENTERED the representation and appointment in the eVoucher system for Kathryn Ann Walton. (KMP) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
6 6 INTERPRETER OATH as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua: Marta Roller placed under oath to interpret Initial Appearance proceedings held on 3/17/2025 before Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. (KMP) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua held on 3/17/2025 before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett: US orally moved for pretrial detention. The def req a joint preliminary and detention hearing. The US did not object to combining the two hearings. Copy of Complaint given to def; Def states true name is Domingo Atlahua-Calihua; Def req CJA; Financial Aff filed; Court FINDS def qualifies for CJA; Court Appts Kathryn Walton as CJA; Def adv of constitutional rights, nature of charges and possible penalties; Court covered standard collateral; US adv no victims req tbh; DETENTION HEARING and PRELIMINARY HEARING set for 3/26/2025 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett; def remanded to custody of USM; USPO to circulate PSR to counsel. (Tape #KYED-LEX__5-25-mj-5028-MAS_20250317_110018.) (Interpreter Marta Roller6 ) Signed by Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. (KMP) cc: COR,USM,USP,D [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Domingo Altahua-Calihua (KMP) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
9 9 INTERPRETER OATH as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua: Jason Knapp placed under oath to interpret Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing proceedings held on 3/26/2025 before Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. (KMP) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
10 10 MINUTE ENTRY FOR PRELIMINARY HEARING & DETENTION HEARING as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua held on 3/26/2025 before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett: Kathryn Walton appeared as Appointed CJA counsel of record. 1. The Court FINDS probable cause to believe that a crime has been committed & that the dft committed the offenses alleged & detailed in the Criminal Complaint. The matter is bound over to the gj for further consideration; 2. The motion of the US for pretrial detention is GRANTED. The Bond Report shall be filed UNDER SEAL; 3. The Dft remains in the custody of USM pending further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. (Tape #KYED-LEX__5-25-mj-5028-MAS_20250326_100817.)(Interpreter Jason Knapp, 29 Oath.) (KM)cc: COR,USM,USP [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 SEALED Bond Report Sealed pursuant to LEAVE OF COURT re10 Detention Hearing & Preliminary Hearing (KM) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
12 12 EXHIBIT & WITNESS LIST held 3/26/2025 as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua (KM) [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 3/31/2025. (KMP)cc: COR,USM,USP [5:25-mj-05028-MAS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
Conflict Check run. (STC)
Related: [-]
14 14 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua (1) count(s) 1. (STC)
Related: [-]
15 15 SEALED UNREDACTED Indictment re14 Indictment by USA as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua (STC)
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION for Arraignment by USA as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua. Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett. (STC)
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER: granting16 Motion for Arraignment as to Domingo Altahua-Calihua ARRAIGNMENT set for 4/23/2025 at 12:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 4/17/2025. (STC)cc: COR,USM,USP,D
Related: [-]