Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00226
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 2:24 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Virgilio Jimenez (1)
Terminated: 04/17/2025
Represented By
Brian Marc Roberts
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 3:33 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
Arrest (Rule 40) of Virgilio Jimenez, filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
Set Hearing as to Virgilio Jimenez: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 4/17/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 702 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo (pns4)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Virgilio Jimenez, filed. (clf4)
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 4/17/2025 before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo as to Virgilio Jimenez. Defendant first appearance on Pretrial Release Violation from the Texas Western District Court 5-22-cr-506 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial Affidavit executed on the record, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing private counsel to be entered for limited purpose (Bryan or Palermo), Waiver of Identity executed on the record, Defendant ordered removed to originating district. Defendant reserved his right to have all hearings he is entitled to in WDTX San Antonio Division Appearances: AUSA Mark McIntyre for USA; Brian Roberts (CJA) for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Crista Orphe) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (clf4)
Related: [-]
RULE 5 Papers sent via email to Texas Western District Court San Antonio Division as to Virgilio Jimenez, filed. (clf4)
Related: [-]
1 1 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release- Western District of Texas San Antonio Division as to Virgilio Jimenez, filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 04/11/2025; Returned Executed on 04/16/2025 as to Virgilio Jimenez. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (pns4)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR LIMITED PURPOSE for Defendant Virgilio Jimenez. Brian Roberts appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (clf4)
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Virgilio Jimenez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (clf4)
Related: [-]
5 5 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Virgilio Jimenez. Defendant committed to the Texas Western District Court. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (clf4)
Related: [-]