Virgin Islands District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00015
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 3:18 AM AST
Defendant
Ashley Saphire Flores (1)
Represented By
Matthew A. Campbell
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Cherrisse R. Woods
Doj-Usao
contact info
Adam Francis Sleeper
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 4:25 AM AST
Monday, March 17, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ashley Saphire Flores (1). (AO) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 ORDER (GAT) APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Ashley Saphire Flores dated 3/17/2025. Matthew A. Campbell for Ashley Saphire Flores appointed. (AO) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER (GAT) Setting Conditions of Release dated 3/17/2025 as to Ashley Saphire Flores (1) $5,000 Unsecured. (AO) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 RELEASED ON BOND (APPEARANCE BOND $ 5,000 Unsecured Bond) as to Ashley Saphire Flores. (AO) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER (GAT) as to Ashley Saphire Flores dated 3/17/2025. (AO) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF HEARING: Bond Hearing set for 3/18/2025 at 10:00 AM in STT Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge G. Alan Teague. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge G. Alan Teague:Initial Appearance as to Ashley Saphire Flores held on 3/17/2025. (AO) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew A. Campbell appearing for Ashley Saphire Flores (Campbell, Matthew) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of Filing Discovery Demand and Brady Request by Ashley Saphire Flores (Campbell, Matthew) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge G. Alan Teague: Bond Hearing as to Ashley Saphire Flores held on 3/18/2025. (AO) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
9 9 ORDER (GAT) as to Ashley Saphire Flores re3 Order Setting Conditions of Release dated 3/18/2025. (AO) [3:25-mj-00017-RAM-GAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 INFORMATION as to Ashley Saphire Flores (1) count(s) 1. Arraignment set for 4/30/2025 at 09:30 AM in STT Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge G. Alan Teague. (AO)
Related: [-]