California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00056
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 12:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Ady Perez (1)
Represented By
Eric Hans Schweitzer
Schweitzer & Davidian, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Cody S. Chapple
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Arin Heinz
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 1:44 AM PDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Ady Perez (1). (Deputy Clerk CRM) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
3 3 REQUEST to Seal by USA as to Ady Perez. (Deputy Clerk CRM) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALING ORDER as to Ady Perez (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/27/2025. (Deputy Clerk CRM) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/4/2025: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Ady Perez (1) is Fully Shackled (USM # 63987-511 ). (Deputy Clerk EV) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
5 5 APPLICATION to Redact Information Contained in Complaint and UNSEAL by USA as to Ady Perez. (Deputy Clerk CRM) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
6 6 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT Related [+] as to Ady Perez. (Deputy Clerk CRM) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-] dacted
7 7 ORDER to Redact Information Contained in Complaint and UNSEAL signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/3/2025 as to Ady Perez. (Deputy Clerk CRM) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eric Hans Schweitzer appearing for Ady Perez. Attorney Schweitzer, Eric Hans added. (Schweitzer, Eric) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 3/3/2025 as to Ady Perez. (Deputy Clerk CRM) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
10 10 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe: INITIAL APPEARANCE re Criminal Complaint as to Ady Perez (1) held on 3/4/2025. Attorney Eric Schweitzer was retained. Defendant advised of charges, rights, and maximum penalties. Defendant received Complaint; waived reading and advisement of rights - DENIALS ENTERED. The government sought detention; defense requested detention hearing. Detention Hearing set for 3/7/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone . The Court ordered the defendant temporarily detained. Preliminary Examination set for 3/18/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean . Government Counsel: Cody Chapple - present. Defense Counsel: Eric Schweitzer - present. U.S. Pretrial Services Officer: Evette Perez - present. Custody Status: in Custody (FCJ) - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Otilia Rosales. (Deputy Clerk EV) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eric Hans Schweitzer appearing for Ady Perez. (Deputy Clerk CRM) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: DETENTION HEARING as to Ady Perez held on 03/07/2025. Government seeks detention. Defense Counsel argues for release. The Court finds good cause to continue the detention hearing as stated on the record. Continued Detention Hearing set for 3/13/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The Court ordered the defendant to be continued temporarily detained. Government Counsel: Cody Chapple present. Defense Counsel: Eric Schweitzer present. U.S. Pretrial Officer: Brian Bedrosian present for Evette Perez. Custody Status: in Custody - FCJ - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO Sonitta Lout. (Deputy Clerk JN) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER a Continuance of the March 18, 2025 Preliminary Hearing to April 1, 2025, and Exclusion of Time by USA. (Chapple, Cody) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
14 14 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Preliminary Hearing Pursuant to Rule 5.1(d) and Exclusion of Time as to Ady Perez (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/11/2025. The Court has read and considered the parties' stipulation to continue the preliminary hearing and exclude time. The Court finds there is good cause for the continuance so as to allow the defendant reasonable time for preparation, fully consider a pre-trial resolution of the case, and for the government's continuing investigation of the case. The Court also finds that the interests of justice served by granting the continuance outweigh the interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Therefore, for good cause shown: (1) The preliminary hearing set on March 18, 2025, is continued to April 1, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto . (2) The period from March 18, 2025, through April 1, 2025, shall be excluded pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 5.1; 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv). (Deputy Clerk EV) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
15 15 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: Continued DETENTION HEARING as to Ady Perez held on 03/13/2025. The matter of Detention is argued. The Court ordered defendant released with conditions, as stated on the record. Preliminary Examination set for 04/01/2025 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto remains set. Government Counsel: Cody Chapple present. Defense Counsel: Eric Schweitzer present. U.S. Pretrial Officer: Evette Perez and Brian Bedrosian present. Custody Status: in Custody - FCJ - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO Mary Yang. (Deputy Clerk JN) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
16 16 COPY OF DEED OF TRUST #2025-0027415 and Original Straight Note RECEIVED, posted by Ernesto Solorio Pulido and Janette Arceli Ramos Vallejo as to Ady Perez. (Deputy Clerk JPX) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS of RELEASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2025. (Deputy Clerk JPX) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
18 18 APPEARANCE and COMPLIANCE BOND signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2025 as to Ady Perez. (Deputy Clerk JPX) [1:25-mj-00017-BAM]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
19 19 INFORMATION (Felony) as to Ady Perez (1) count(s) 1. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 B.Sheet
20 20 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Ady Perez. Attorney Chapple, Cody S. added. (Chapple, Cody)
Related: [-]