Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00804
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 2:54 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matt Ian Kass
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Juan Jose Cruz-Martinez (1)
Terminated: 04/16/2025
Represented By
Jesse R. Coronado
Law Offices Of Jesse R. Coronado
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 4:47 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
Arrest of Juan Jose Cruz-Martinez (drda)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Juan Jose Cruz-Martinez. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Juan Jose Cruz-Martinez. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Juan Jose Cruz-Martinez. (drda)
Related: [-]