Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00055
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 3:27 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Darryl James Mitchell
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Raul Hector Vasquez-Robles (1)
Terminated: 04/17/2025
Represented By
Andrew William Grindrod
Office Of The Federal Public Defender For The Eastern Distri
contact info
Michael Tagliabue
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 4:40 AM EDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Raul Hector Vasquez-Robles (1). (jhie, )
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT by USA in support of1 Criminal Complaint as to Raul Hector Vasquez-Robles (jhie, )
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM in case as to Raul Hector Vasquez-Robles. (jhie, )
Related: [-]