Washington Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00150
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 1:20 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michelle Jensen
Us Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mohammad Jawaid Aziz (1)
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Cooper Offenbecher
Allen Hansen Maybrown & Offenbecher, Ps
contact info
Nancy Tenney
Federal Public Defender'S Office (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 4:04 AM PDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
Arrest of Mohammad Jawaid Aziz on 3/21/2025. (JES)
Related: [-]
Case unsealed due to arrest as to Mohammad Jawaid Aziz. (AQ)
Related: [-]
1 1 CHARGING DOCUMENT RECEIVED FROM the District of Minnesota as to Mohammad Jawaid Aziz. (JES)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER appointing Nancy Tenney for Mohammad Jawaid Aziz. On the basis of the defendant's sworn financial statement, the court finds that they are financially unable to retain counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender for the Western District of Washington be and hereby is appointed to represent the defendant pursuant to Title 18 United States Code 3006A. Approved by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (No.pdf image attached) (JES)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. S. Kate Vaughan- CRD: J. Sands ; AUSA: Michelle Jensen ; Def Cnsl: Nancy Tenney ; PTS: Mike Munsterman ; Court Reporter: Digital Recording ; Time of Hearing: 2:00PM ; Courtroom: 12B ; INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) PROCEEDINGS as to Mohammad Jawaid Aziz held on 3/21/2025. Defendant present in custody. Financial Affidavit reviewed. Counsel appointed. Defendant advised of rights. Defendant advised of allegations and penalties from the District of Minnesota. Defendant waives Identity and Preliminary Hearing in this district. Government moves for detention. Defense counsel requests a detention hearing. Hearing set and defendant remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 3/25/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (JES) Modified on 3/27/2025. (AQ).
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Mohammad Jawaid Aziz. (JES)
Related: [-]