Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:25-bk-10739
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Molecular Templates, Inc.
124 Washington St. Suite 101
Foxboro, MA 02035
Represented By
Austin Park
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Eric D. Schwartz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jake A. Rauchberg
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 10:26 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global
222 N. Pacific Coast Highway Suite 300
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kcc Llc Dba Verita Global
contact info
Creditor
K2 HealthVentures LLC
Represented By
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Samuel A. Newman
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Francesca L. Sadler
Sidley Autin LLP
contact info
Jeri Leigh Miller
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Shanti M. Katona
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Michael Vincent DiPietro
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Creditor
The County of Williamson, Texas
McCreary Veselka Bragg & Allen PC Attn: Julie Anne Parsons PO Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Julie Anne Parsons
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg, & Allen, P.C.
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
73 73 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/07 11:17 PM
Certificate of Service re: 1) Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Lender, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (V) Granting Related Relief; 2) Debtors Application for Authorization to Employ and Retain Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global as Administrative Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date; and 3) Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing Retention and Employment of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 56 ,57 ,58
72 72 motion Authorize - Motion Wed 05/07 3:51 PM
Motion to Authorize // Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Professionals Used in the Ordinary Course Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Molecular Templates, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/14/2025. (Park, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Proposed Order
71 71 7 pgs motion Motion for Order Re: Interim Compensation Procedures Wed 05/07 3:46 PM
Motion for Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals Filed by Molecular Templates, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/14/2025. (Park, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Proposed Order
70 70 order Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 05/07 11:38 AM
Order Approving Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Related [+] Order Signed on 5/7/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 27 ,66
69 69 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Wed 05/07 11:36 AM
Order (I) Establishing Certain Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim Against the Debtors, and (II) Granting Related Relief, Including Notice and Filing Procedures Related [+] Order Signed on 5/7/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/17/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 26 ,65
Att: 1 Declaration 1: Claim Form
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Bar Date Notice
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Publication Notice
68 68 order Reject Lease or Executory Contract Wed 05/07 11:32 AM
Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Reject Certain Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, and (B) Abandon any Personal Property that Remains at Leased Premises, and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 5/7/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 22 ,64
Att: 1 Schedule 1: Rejected Leases
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
67 67 11 pgs motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Tue 05/06 9:46 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Rock Creek Advisors, LLC as Financial Advisor for the Debtor, Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed By Molecular Templates, Inc.(Rauchberg, Jake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
66 66 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 05/06 4:07 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs Related [+] Filed by Molecular Templates, Inc.. (Park, Austin)
Related: [-] 27 ,47
65 65 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 05/06 4:06 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Certain Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim Against the Debtors, and (II) Granting Related Relief, Including Notice and Filing Procedures Related [+] Filed by Molecular Templates, Inc.. (Park, Austin)
Related: [-] 26 ,47
64 64 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 05/06 4:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' First Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Reject Certain Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, and (B) Abandon any Personal Property that Remains at Leased Premises, and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Molecular Templates, Inc.. (Park, Austin)
Related: [-] 22 ,44
63 63 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 2:04 PM
Certificate of Service re: Documents Served On or Before April 24, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 3 ,5 ,6 ,10 ,11 ,12 ,13 ,14 ,15 ,16 ,17 ,18 ,22 ,25 ,26 ,27 ,29 ,34 ,35 ,36 ,37 ,38 ,39 ,40 ,41 ,44 ,45 ,46 ,47 ,51 ,53
Monday, May 05, 2025
62 62 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 05/05 4:42 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Jeffrey D. Prol Related [+] Order Signed on 5/5/2025. (JMW)
Related: [-] 60
61 61 trustee Statement Committee Has Not Been Appointed Mon 05/05 9:56 AM
Statement That Unsecured Creditors' Committee Has Not Been Appointed Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Leamy, Jane)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
60 60 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 05/02 3:56 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Jeffrey D. Prol of Lowenstein Sandler LLP . Receipt Number 4677447, Filed by Molecular Templates, Inc.. (Rauchberg, Jake)
Related: [-]
59 59 8 pgs motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Fri 05/02 3:19 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Lowenstein Sandler LLP as Special Corporate Counsel Filed by Molecular Templates, Inc.. Objections due by 5/16/2025. (Park, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
58 58 10 pgs motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Wed 04/30 10:04 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtors Filed by Molecular Templates, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/14/2025. (Schwartz, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
57 57 9 pgs motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Wed 04/30 9:21 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global as Administrative Advisor Filed by Molecular Templates, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/14/2025. (Park, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B