Colorado District Court
Judge:Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:25-cv-01246
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 1:27 AM MDT
Defendant
AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
6000 American Parkway
Madison, WI 57373
Plaintiff
Nancy Montoya
8458 W. Toller Ave
Littleton, CO 80128
Represented By
Danielle Curtis
Curtis Walton Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 11:40 AM
ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/22/2025. Consent Form due by 6/10/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/17/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2025 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 misc Summons Issued Mon 04/21 8:18 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Saturday, April 19, 2025
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 04/21 8:17 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/19 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT against AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10289213)Attorney Danielle Curtis added to party Nancy Montoya(pty:pla), filed by Nancy Montoya.(Curtis, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons