California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 2:25-cv-03486
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 12:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Pam Bondi
Defendant
John Daly, Jr.
Defendant
Lory Torres
Plaintiff
MINHONG QIAN
Represented By
Joel E. Spence
Law Offices Of Joel Spence
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 11:22 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint9 as to defendants Pam Bondi, John J. Daley, Jr, Lory Torres. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 notice Summons Request Thu 04/24 5:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),9 filed by plaintiff Minhong Qian. (Spence, Joel)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Deficiency in Summons Thu 04/24 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request2 , The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The Court has DEEMED Complaint docket no.9 as the Operative complaint11 . The request for summons is not applicable2 . Filer is to file New Summons request with complete case number with Judge and Magistrate's initials : 2:25cv3486 FLA (DFMx). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 04/24 3:20 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)9 Is DEEMED THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINT. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 04/23 4:57 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer refiled COMPLAINT again correcting Plaintiff's Name ( original complaint named plaintiff incorrectly). Case number Missing mandatory assigned Judge and Magistrate Judge case number should read as: 2:25-cv-3486FLA(DFMx) REFER TO DOCKET NO. 5. Clerk unable to determine the propriety of filing a "COMPLAINT" instead of an amended complaint. Currently case as TWO COMPLAINTS. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/22 6:00 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405.00 paid on 04/22/2025, receipt number ACACDC-39541504), filed by plaintiff Minhong Qian.(Spence, Joel)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Deficiency in Summons Tue 04/22 5:47 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request2 . The following error(s) was found: Complaint and Summons caption do not match.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/22 5:41 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Plaintiff's name is incomplete on the caption of the complaint. Counsel may e-file an amended complaint with the full name of the Plaintiff. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/22 5:37 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/22 5:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sat 04/19 12:56 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff MINHONG QIAN, (Spence, Joel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Sat 04/19 12:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MINHONG QIAN. (Spence, Joel)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Sat 04/19 12:54 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff MINHONG QIAN. (Spence, Joel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sat 04/19 12:52 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39541504 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff MINHONG QIAN. (Attorney Joel E. Spence added to party MINHONG QIAN(pty:pla))(Spence, Joel)
Related: [-]