California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:25-cv-03473
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 12:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Pam Bondi
US Dept of Justice 950 Pennsyvania Ave NW
Robert F Kennedy DOJ Building, DC 20530
Defendant
CONNIE NOLAN
USCIS - SCOPS Office of Chief Counsel 5900 Capital Gateway Dr MS 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Defendant
Director Kika Scott
U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES C/O Office of Chief Counsel 5900 Capital Gateway Dr MS 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Plaintiff
Qiaochu Wang
1155 N First Street #106
San Jose, CA 95112
Represented By
Alison Yew
Yew Immigration Law Group A P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 04/29 7:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Qiaochu Wang. Pam Bondi served on 4/22/2025, answer due 6/23/2025; Kristi Noem served on 4/22/2025, answer due 6/23/2025; Connie Nolan served on 4/22/2025, answer due 6/23/2025. (Yew, Alison)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 04/28 9:07 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .***Incorrect event used. Please re-file in its entirety, using event: Summons Returned Executed as to USA. When prompted, select the party(ies) served and enter the applicable date(s) of service for each.*** Re:7 Certificate of Service filed by Qiaochu Wang (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Sun 04/27 8:34 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qiaochu Wang (Yew, Alison)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Sat 04/26 2:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Qiaochu Wang.. (Yew, Alison)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Mon 04/21 10:08 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 04/21 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Pam Bondi, Kristi Noem, Connie Nolan, Kika Scott, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 04/21 8:06 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Sat 04/19 11:49 AM
Proposed Summons. (Yew, Alison)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/19 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT for mandamus and viol of APA against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20586516.). Filed by Qiaochu Wang.(Yew, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet