Washington Western District Court
Judge:Grady J Leupold
Case #: 2:25-cv-00711
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2025
Terminated:May 20, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 12:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Aguilar/Fawcett Investment Properties LLC
Defendant
Sound on Wheels
Plaintiff
Brent Rotter
Represented By
Peter Roy Barnett
Law Office Of Peter R Barnett PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/20 11:28 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) re3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. (KAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) Mon 05/19 8:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by All Plaintiffs (Barnett, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 11:12 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendants Aguilar Fawcett Investment Properties LLC (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/22 8:46 AM
Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 04/20 7:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Related [+] filed by Brent Rotter.(Barnett, Peter)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8937642
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Business Entity Disclosure,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet