Original Case: 1:24-cv-00110

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-civil-01361
Typecivil / private / contract
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
LOAN FUNDER LLC, SERIES 44501
Represented By
Matthew R. Braucher
Braucher & Amann PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROC360, LLC
Represented By
Matthew R. Braucher
Braucher & Amann PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VITALITY LAND HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By
Andrew Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Nicholas J. Hemond
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Katie L. Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GIANFRANCO MARROCCO
Represented By
Andrew Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Nicholas J. Hemond
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Katie L. Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CARLOS TOBON
Represented By
Andrew Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Nicholas J. Hemond
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Katie L. Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALEJANDRA TOBON
Represented By
Andrew Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Nicholas J. Hemond
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Katie L. Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JUAN URIONA
Represented By
Andrew Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Nicholas J. Hemond
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info
Katie L. Howayeck
Darrow Everett LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/21/2025 5:13 AM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #18) filed by Appellants Gianfranco Marrocco, Alejandra Tobon, Carlos Tobon, Juan Uriona and Vitality Land Holdings, LLC. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 05/02/2025. 25-1361 (GB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 6 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF